Moore et al v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: BJH, a minor, Darlyn Harris Moore and B.J.H.
Defendant: Genie Pierson, SSM Health Care St Louis dba SSM Health Care St Mary's, Department of Health and Human Services, United States of America and SSM Health Care St Louis
Case Number: 4:2019cv01956
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Rodney W Sippel
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Darlyn Harris Moore, B.J.H.. SSM Health Care St Louis served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019. (Finney, Daniel)
August 21, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Darlyn Harris Moore, B.J.H.. Defendant United States of America (US Attorney) served on 8/19/2019, answer due 10/18/2019. (ARL)
August 6, 2019 Summons Issued as to defendant Genie Pierson, SSM Health Care St Louis, United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The summons were emailed to Daniel P. Finney, Jr.. (ARL)
August 5, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs B.J.H., Darlyn Harris Moore Process Server: Notice of Intent to Use Process Server (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form, #3 Summons Summons Directed to Attorney General, #4 Summons Summons Directed to US Attorney, #5 Summons Summons to Genie Pierson MD, #6 Summons Summons to SSM St Marys Hospital)(Finney, Daniel)
July 22, 2019 Receipt 4644081391 in the amount of $400.00 for CIVIL FILING FEE on behalf of Finney Law Office (CCAM)
July 16, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Rodney W. Sippel. Attorney notified as to proper documents required to open case. (BAK)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants Jury Demand,, filed by Darlyn Harris Moore. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Standard form 95, #2 Exhibit DHSS Denial Letter)(Finney, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore et al v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genie Pierson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSM Health Care St Louis dba SSM Health Care St Mary's
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSM Health Care St Louis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BJH, a minor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darlyn Harris Moore
Represented By: Daniel P. Finney, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B.J.H.
Represented By: Daniel P. Finney, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?