National General Insurance Company v. Pirzadah
Plaintiff: Notional General Insurance Company and National General Insurance Company
Defendant: Mohammed Pirzadah
Case Number: 4:2019cv01962
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Henry Edward Autrey
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Filing 8 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Mohammed Pirzadah.(Drazen, Andrew)
August 13, 2019 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Andrew T, Drazen for Defendant Mohammed Pirzadah. (Drazen, Andrew)
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Mohammed Pirzadah.(Page, John)
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by John J. Page for Defendant Mohammed Pirzadah. (Page, John)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff National General Insurance Company. Parent companies: National General Holdings Corp., Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: National General Holdings Corp.,. (Wilke, James)
July 16, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Waivers issued 1. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Henry E. Autrey. (MFG)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 Waiver of Service Returned Unexecuted filed by National General Insurance Company as to Mohammed Pirzadah. (Wilke, James)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 WAIVER of Service issued defendant Mohammed Pirzadah. sent to Mohammed Pirzasah on July 16, 2019 filed by National General Insurance Company. Waiver of Service due by 8/15/2019. (Wilke, James)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Mohammed Pirzadah with receipt number AMOEDC-7332454, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by National General Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form)(Wilke, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National General Insurance Company v. Pirzadah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohammed Pirzadah
Represented By: John J. Page
Represented By: Andrew T, Drazen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Notional General Insurance Company
Represented By: James A. Wilke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National General Insurance Company
Represented By: James A. Wilke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?