Floden v. Schneider Electric IT Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Latona R. Floden
Defendant: Schneider Electric IT Corporation and John Doe Business Entity
Case Number: 4:2019cv02016
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Patricia L Cohen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion to continue [ECF No. 14] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Rule 16 Conference now scheduled for September 18, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. is RESCHEDULED for Tuesday, September 24, 2019, at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 9N on the ninth floor of the Thomas F. Eagleton U.S. Courthouse. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on September 13, 2019. (MCB)
September 13, 2019 Filing 14 Joint MOTION to Continue Rule 16 Conference by Defendant Schneider Electric IT Corporation. (Christensen, Rebecca)
September 9, 2019 Filing 13 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiff Latona R. Floden. . (Ponder, Douglas)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Staci Ketay Rotman by Defendant Schneider Electric IT Corporation. ; #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jennifer L. Jones by Defendant Schneider Electric IT Corporation. ; ORDERED: Motions are GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on September 5, 2019. (MCB)
September 4, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Staci Ketay Rotman. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-7439359) by Defendant Schneider Electric IT Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rotman, Staci)
September 4, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jennifer L. Jones. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-7437526) by Defendant Schneider Electric IT Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Jones, Jennifer)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RULE 16 ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 2-Standard Joint Scheduling Plan due by 9/11/2019. Rule 16 Conference set for 9/18/2019 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 8/15/2019.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on 8/8/19. (KJS)
July 22, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Schneider Electric IT Corporation.(Christensen, Rebecca)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Schneider Electric IT Corporation Sent To: State Court - Executed (Christensen, Rebecca)
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Rebecca M. Christensen for Defendant Schneider Electric IT Corporation. (Christensen, Rebecca)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Schneider Electric IT Corporation. Parent companies: Schneider Electric Holdings, Inc., Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Christensen, Rebecca)
July 16, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen. (BAK)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Schneider Electric IT Corporation Sent To: Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Christensen, Rebecca)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, St. Charles County, Missouri, filed by Latona R. Floden.(BAK)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Charles County Circuit Court, case number 1911-CC00565, with receipt number AMOEDC-7336367, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Schneider Electric IT Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Christensen, Rebecca) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/16/2019: #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form) (BAK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Floden v. Schneider Electric IT Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latona R. Floden
Represented By: Douglas B. Ponder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schneider Electric IT Corporation
Represented By: Rebecca M. Christensen
Represented By: Jennifer Jones
Represented By: Staci Ketay Rotman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Business Entity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?