Barbulica Property Development, LLC v. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc.
Plaintiff: Barbulica Property Development and Barbulica Property Development, LLC
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv02113
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Audrey G Fleissig
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Docket Text ORDER: Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice [ECF No. #17 ] is SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 8/20/2019. (AFC)
August 19, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Barbulica Property Development, LLC (Dickhaus, Karl)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that on or before August 20, 2019, Plaintiff shall show cause in writing why the relief requested in Defendant's motion to dismiss (ECF No. #11 ) should not be granted. Failure to comply with this Order may result in the dismissal of this case without further notice. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 8/13/19. (KXS)
August 5, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc. Notice to Plaintiff of Filing Amended Notice of Removal Sent To: Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Cantwell, Emily)
August 5, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE Amended Notice of Removal: by Defendant Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Cantwell, Emily)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that no later than seven days from the date of this Order, Defendant shall file an amended notice of removal, to allege jurisdictional facts establishing Plaintiff's citizenship. Failure to fully and timely comply with this Order will result in the remand of this case for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff may file a response no later thanseven days from the date the amended notice of removal is filed. No further briefing will be permitted. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 8/1/19. (EAB)
July 24, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss :for Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Cantwell, Emily)
July 24, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Dismiss :for Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction by Defendant Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc.. (Cantwell, Emily)
July 24, 2019 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael J. Abrams for Defendant Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc.. (Abrams, Michael)
July 24, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Audrey G. Fleissig. (MFG)
July 24, 2019 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENTAL State Court Docket Sheet. (MFG)
July 24, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc. Sent To: State Court - Executed (Cantwell, Emily)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc.. Parent companies: Wells Fargo & Company, Publicly held company: Yes,. (Cantwell, Emily)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Temporary Restraining Order granting #5 Motion for TRO Signed by Judge John D. Warner, Jr. (St. Louis County Circuit Court) on 06/18/2019. (MFG)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Plaintiff Barbulica Property Development, LLC. (MFG)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Barbulica Property Development, LLC. (MFG)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis County, filed by Barbulica Property Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(MFG)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Removal)(Cantwell, Emily)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis County Circuit Court, case number 19SL-CC02366, with receipt number AMOEDC-7347834, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Original Filing Form)(Cantwell, Emily)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barbulica Property Development, LLC v. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbulica Property Development
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbulica Property Development, LLC
Represented By: Karl W. Dickhaus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc.
Represented By: Emily E. Cantwell
Represented By: Michael J. Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?