Naes v. City of St. Louis, Missouri et al
Plaintiff: Louis Naes
Defendant: Angela Coonce, John Hayden, St. Louis, City of and City of St. Louis, Missouri
Case Number: 4:2019cv02132
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: John A Ross
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Louis Naes (Petruska, Lynette)
August 13, 2019 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Kelly Lynn Camilleri for Defendant Angela Coonce. (Camilleri, Kelly)
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Kelly Lynn Camilleri for Defendant John Hayden. (Camilleri, Kelly)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Kelly Lynn Camilleri for Defendant City of St. Louis, Missouri. (Camilleri, Kelly)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Louis Naes Angela Coonce waiver signed on 7/23/2019, answer due 9/23/2019. (Petruska, Lynette)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Louis Naes John Hayden waiver signed on 7/23/2019, answer due 9/23/2019. (Petruska, Lynette)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Louis Naes City of St. Louis, Missouri waiver signed on 7/23/2019, answer due 9/23/2019. (Petruska, Lynette)
July 24, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Waivers issued 3. Judge Assigned: Honorable John A. Ross. (MFG)
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number AMOEDC-7350375, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Louis Naes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Waiver of Service)(Petruska, Lynette)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Naes v. City of St. Louis, Missouri et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Coonce
Represented By: Kelly Lynn Camilleri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Hayden
Represented By: Kelly Lynn Camilleri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Louis, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of St. Louis, Missouri
Represented By: Kelly Lynn Camilleri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Naes
Represented By: Lynette M. Petruska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?