Pippin Towing & Recovery, LLC v. Mr. Pippin's Truck Service, LLC
Plaintiff: Pippin Towing & Recovery, LLC
Defendant: Mr. Pippin's Truck Service, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv02143
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Henry Edward Autrey
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Mr. Pippin's Truck Service, LLC. (Cooley, Drey)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #14 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document by Plaintiff Pippin Towing & Recovery, LLC. (Kelly, Don) filed by Pippin Towing & Recovery, LLC ; LEAVE TO FILE SEALED DOCUMENT IS GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 09/12/2019. (AAS)
September 11, 2019 Filing 15 SEALED DOCUMENT re #13 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion by Plaintiff Pippin Towing & Recovery, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A2, #2 Exhibit A3, #3 Exhibit A4)(Kelly, Don)
September 11, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document by Plaintiff Pippin Towing & Recovery, LLC. (Kelly, Don)
September 11, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Plaintiff Pippin Towing & Recovery, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A1, #3 Exhibit A5)(Kelly, Don)
September 8, 2019 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Mr. Pippin's Truck Service, LLC. Parent companies: none, Subsidiaries: none, Publicly held company: none,. (Cooley, Drey)
September 4, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Mr. Pippin's Truck Service, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Cooley, Drey)
September 4, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Mr. Pippin's Truck Service, LLC. (Cooley, Drey)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #7 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Responsive Pleading Out of Time and to Extend Time for Filing Responsive Pleading Through September 4, 2019 by Defendant Mr. Pippin's Truck Service, LLC. (Cooley, Drey) filed by Mr. Pippin's Truck Service, LLC ; GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 8/28/19. (KJS)
August 27, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #7 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Responsive Pleading Out of Time and to Extend Time for Filing Responsive Pleading Through September 4, 2019 filed by Defendant Mr. Pippin's Truck Service, LLC. (Cooley, Drey)
August 27, 2019 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Responsive Pleading Out of Time and to Extend Time for Filing Responsive Pleading Through September 4, 2019 by Defendant Mr. Pippin's Truck Service, LLC. (Cooley, Drey)
August 27, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Drey A. Cooley for Defendant Mr. Pippin's Truck Service, LLC. (Cooley, Drey)
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Pippin Towing & Recovery, LLC. Mr. Pippin's Truck Service, LLC served on 7/30/2019, answer due 8/20/2019. (Kelly, Don)
July 25, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to Don V. Kelly. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Henry E. Autrey. (MFG)
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT to Commissioner of filing or determination of an action regarding trademark. (MFG)
July 24, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Pippin Towing & Recovery, LLC Process Server: Martin Hueckel (Kelly, Don)
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Pippin Towing & Recovery, LLC.. (Kelly, Don)
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Pippin Towing & Recovery, LLC against defendant Mr. Pippin's Truck Service, LLC with receipt number AMOEDC-7354152, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Pippin Towing & Recovery, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons Summons)(Kelly, Don)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pippin Towing & Recovery, LLC v. Mr. Pippin's Truck Service, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pippin Towing & Recovery, LLC
Represented By: Don V. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Pippin's Truck Service, LLC
Represented By: Drey A. Cooley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?