Jordan v. Sugartree Homes Association of St. Louis County et al
Plaintiff: Cynthia Jordan
Defendant: Samuel O. Heiman, Sugartree Homes Association of St. Louis County and UAH, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv02144
Filed: July 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: John A Ross
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 42:3604
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 11. Mailed to party not set up for electronic notification Mon Sep 16 09:45:04 CDT 2019 (Stamm, Katie)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion for default judgment #7 is DENIED on the merits.. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 9/16/19. (KKS)
August 2, 2019 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Jon R. Sanner for Defendant Sugartree Homes Association of St. Louis County. (Sanner, Jon)
July 30, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Sugartree Homes Association of St. Louis County Sent To: State Court - Executed (Butterfield, Michael)
July 25, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable John A. Ross. (MFG)
July 25, 2019 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENTAL State Court Docket Sheet. (MFG)
July 25, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Default Judgment by Plaintiff Cynthia Jordan. (MFG)
July 25, 2019 Filing 6 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis County, filed by Cynthia Jordan.(MFG)
July 25, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) #1 Notice of Removal Petition, filed by Defendant Fran Sugartree Homes Association of St. Louis County. (Butterfield, Michael)
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Fran Sugartree Homes Association of St. Louis County Sent To: Plaintiff (Butterfield, Michael)
July 25, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Fran Sugartree Homes Association of St. Louis County. Parent companies: NONE, Subsidiaries: NONE, Publicly held company: NO,. (Butterfield, Michael)
July 25, 2019 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael S. Butterfield for Defendant Fran Sugartree Homes Association of St. Louis County. (Butterfield, Michael)
July 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for the County of St. Louis, case number 18SL-CC04295, with receipt number AMOEDC-7354516, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Sugartree Homes Association of St. Louis County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Petition, #2 Exhibit State Court Filings, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form)(Butterfield, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jordan v. Sugartree Homes Association of St. Louis County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel O. Heiman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sugartree Homes Association of St. Louis County
Represented By: Michael S. Butterfield
Represented By: Jon R. Sanner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UAH, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?