Johnson v. W.L. Gore & Associates, Inc
Plaintiff: Roosevelt Johnson, III
Defendant: W.L. Gore & Associates, Inc
Case Number: 4:2019cv02316
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Jean C Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Plaintiff Roosevelt Johnson, III. (Brown, Daniel) filed by Roosevelt Johnson, III ; ORDERED GRANTED.( Response to Court due by 10/3/2019.). Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 09/23/2019. (AAS)
September 21, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Plaintiff Roosevelt Johnson, III. (Brown, Daniel)
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant W.L. Gore & Associates, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Barton, Jonathan)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #2 Petition (Removal/Transfer) by Defendant W.L. Gore & Associates, Inc. (Barton, Jonathan) filed by W.L. Gore & Associates, Inc ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 8/14/19. (KJS)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #2 Petition (Removal/Transfer) by Defendant W.L. Gore & Associates, Inc. (Barton, Jonathan)
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant W.L. Gore & Associates, Inc. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Barton, Jonathan)
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant W.L. Gore & Associates, Inc Sent To: Plaintiff (BAK)
August 8, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Jean C. Hamilton. Attorney notified to file Notice to Plaintiff of Removal. (BAK)
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, City of St. Louis, filed by Roosevelt Johnson, III.(BAK)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of the City of St. Louis, case number 1622-cc10491, with receipt number AMOEDC-7383620, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by W.L. Gore & Associates, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-State Court Filings, #3 Exhibit B-Petition, #4 Exhibit C-State Court Notice, #5 Original Filing Form)(Barton, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. W.L. Gore & Associates, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W.L. Gore & Associates, Inc
Represented By: Jonathan T. Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roosevelt Johnson, III
Represented By: Daniel R. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?