Patton v Lutheran Senior Services
Plaintiff: Verlisa Patton
Defendant: Lutheran Senior Services
Case Number: 4:2019cv02319
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Noelle C Collins
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RULE 16 ORDER: This case is assigned to Track: 2 (Standard). Joint Scheduling Plan due by 10/23/2019. Rule 16 Conference set for 10/30/2019 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins. Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on September 16, 2019. (BRP)
September 11, 2019 Filing 13 FULL CONSENT has been received by Defendant Lutheran Senior Services, Plaintiff Verlisa Patton. (TMT)
September 11, 2019 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by Carrie A. Claiborne for Defendant Lutheran Senior Services. (Claiborne, Carrie)
September 5, 2019 Notice from Clerk instructing Defendant Lutheran Senior Services to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 9/12/2019. (KCB)
August 29, 2019 Filing 11 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by Lutheran Senior Services.(Leveque, Kate)
August 28, 2019 Notice from Clerk instructing Plaintiff Verlisa Patton to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 9/4/2019. (KCB)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading (Doc. #9 ) is GRANTED. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Petition on or before August 29, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 08/23/2019. (KBL)
August 22, 2019 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Defendant Lutheran Senior Services. (Leveque, Kate)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading (Doc. #7 ) is GRANTED. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Petition on or before August 22, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 8/16/2019. (KBL)
August 15, 2019 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 Petition (Removal/Transfer) by Defendant Lutheran Senior Services. (Leveque, Kate)
August 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Lutheran Senior Services Acknowledgement Sent To: State Court - Executed (Leveque, Kate)
August 8, 2019 Filing 5 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
August 8, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins. (BAK)
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, St. Louis County, Missouri, filed by Verlisa Patton.(BAK)
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Lutheran Senior Services. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Leveque, Kate)
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Lutheran Senior Services Sent To: Plaintiff (Leveque, Kate)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Twenty-First Judicial Circuit Court of Saint Louis County, Missouri, case number 19SL-CC02311, with receipt number AMOEDC-7385793, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Lutheran Senior Services. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A (State Court File and Docket Sheet), #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Leveque, Kate)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patton v Lutheran Senior Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lutheran Senior Services
Represented By: Kate M. Leveque
Represented By: Carrie A. Claiborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Verlisa Patton
Represented By: John M. Eccher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?