Naert v. Geico Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Adam Naert
Defendant: Geico Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv02339
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen N Limbaugh
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY (no pdf attached)for proceedings held before District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr: Rule 16 Conference held on 9/30/2019. Conference held by phone. CMO to issue. (Notice only, no.pdf attached.) (proceedings started: 10:35 A.M.) (proceedings ended: 10:42 A.M.) (Appearance for Plaintiff: William Meehan) (Appearance for Defendant: Brendon Sanders)(CMH)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 2, Standard Motion to Join Parties due by 11/29/2019. Discovery Completion due by 12/28/2020. Non-Dispositive Motions due by 12/28/2020. ADR Future Reference 1/3/2020. Jury Trial set for 4/12/2021 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3N before District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr. SEE ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL SCHEDULING DEADLINES. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 09/30/19. (CMH) Modified on 10/1/2019 (CMH).
September 19, 2019 Filing 12 Amended ANSWER to Complaint Amending Affirmative Defenses Only by Geico Casualty Insurance Company.(Sanders, Brendon)
September 11, 2019 Filing 11 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Defendant Geico Casualty Insurance Company. . (Sanders, Brendon)
September 9, 2019 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Geico Casualty Insurance Company. Parent companies: GEICO Corporation, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Sanders, Brendon)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RULE 16 ORDER Joint Scheduling Plan due by 9/23/2019. Rule 16 Conference set for 9/30/2019 10:30 AM in Telephone before District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr... Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 08/29/19. (CMH)
August 13, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Geico Casualty Insurance Company.(Sanders, Brendon)
August 13, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr.. (BAK)
August 13, 2019 Filing 7 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, City of St. Louis, filed by Adam Naert.(BAK)
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Russell F. Watters for Defendant Geico Casualty Insurance Company. (Watters, Russell)
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Geico Casualty Insurance Company Sent To: State Court - Unexecuted (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Removal)(Sanders, Brendon)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Geico Casualty Insurance Company Sent To: Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Removal)(Sanders, Brendon)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Brendon T. Sanders for Defendant Geico Casualty Insurance Company. (Sanders, Brendon)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Geico Casualty Insurance Company. Parent companies: Geico Corporation, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Sanders, Brendon)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis City, case number 1922-CC10879, with receipt number AMOEDC-7392280, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Geico Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Original Filing Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A - State Court File, #4 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's Petition, #5 Exhibit C - Policy)(Sanders, Brendon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Naert v. Geico Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Naert
Represented By: William K. Meehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geico Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Brendon T. Sanders
Represented By: Russell F. Watters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?