eShipping, LLC v. Trans USA Trucks, Inc.
Plaintiff: eShipping, LLC
Defendant: Trans USA Trucks, Inc. and West Wind Logistics, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv02340
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Jean C Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 49:14704
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Summons Issued as to defendant West Wind Logistics, Inc.. The summons was emailed to C. Fredric Marcinak. (KJS)
October 2, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM re #6 Amended Complaint, Certificate of Service of Amended Complaint on Trans USA Trucks, Inc. by Plaintiff eShipping, LLC. (Marcinak, C.)
October 1, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants Non-Jury demand, , filed by eShipping, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons for newly added defendant West Wind Logistics, Inc.)(Marcinak, C.) (Additional attachment(s) added at the request of the attorney on 10/2/2019: #2 Exhibit A) (AAS).
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff shall, within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order, file appropriate motions for entry of default and for default judgment, supported by all necessary affidavits and documentation, as well as proposed orders for the Court's consideration. Failure to comply with this order may result in dismissal without prejudice.. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 10/1/2019. (JMP)
August 28, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by eShipping, LLC. Trans USA Trucks, Inc. served on 8/27/2019, answer due 9/17/2019. (Marcinak, C.)
August 13, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Jean C. Hamilton. (MFG)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff eShipping, LLC Process Server: Missouri Process Serving (Marcinak, C.)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENTAL re #1 Complaint, Original Filing Form by Plaintiff eShipping, LLC. (Marcinak, C.)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Trans USA Trucks, Inc. with receipt number AMOEDC-7392392, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by eShipping, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Summons)(Marcinak, C.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: eShipping, LLC v. Trans USA Trucks, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans USA Trucks, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Wind Logistics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: eShipping, LLC
Represented By: C. Fredric Marcinak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?