St.Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Council et al v. Kotva
Plaintiff: John Gaal, Dan Barger, Robert Calhoun, Rocky Kloth, Dan Neiswander, Dennis Joyce, Carpenters' Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis, Robert Behlman, Craig McPartlin, Todd Hake, Greg Hesser, St.Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Council, Mike Hart, Kevin Deptula, Tim Wies, James Carson, Kent Kiefner, Mike Weis, Albert Bond, Scott Byrne, Carpenters' Pension Trust Fund of St. Louis, Donald J. Brussel, Jr., Donald J. Brussell, Jr., Tod O'Donaghue, Carpenters' Joint Training Fund of St. Louis, Tim Schoolfield, Keith Taylor, Mark Boehms, Carpenters' Vacation Trust Fund of St. Louis and Jim Sauer
Defendant: Richard Kotva
Case Number: 4:2019cv02347
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Clark
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 7 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Defendant Richard Kotva (CLO)(Copy mailed to defendant at address listed on Summons Returned Executed #3 )
October 3, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #5 MOTION for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiffs Dan Barger, Robert Behlman, Mark Boehms, Albert Bond, Albert Bond, Albert Bond, Albert Bond, Donald J. Brussel, Jr, Donald J. Brussel, Jr, Donald J. Brussell, Jr, Scott Byrne, Scott Byrne, Scott Byrne, Scott Byrne, Robert Calhoun, Robert Calhoun, Robert Calhoun, Carpenters' Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters' Joint Training Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters' Pension Trust Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters' Vacation Trust Fund of St. Louis, James Carson, James Carson, James Carson, Kevin Deptula, Kevin Deptula, Kevin Deptula, Kevin Deptula, John Gaal, Todd Hake, Todd Hake, Todd Hake, Todd Hake, Mike Hart, Greg Hesser, Greg Hesser, Greg Hesser, Dennis Joyce, Dennis Joyce, Dennis Joyce, Kent Kiefner, Rocky Kloth, Rocky Kloth, Rocky Kloth, Rocky Kloth, Craig McPartlin, Craig McPartlin, Craig McPartlin, Dan Neiswander, Dan Neiswander, Dan Neiswander, Tod O'Donaghue, Tod O'Donaghue, Tod O'Donaghue, Jim Sauer, Jim Sauer, Jim Sauer, Tim Schoolfield, Tim Schoolfield, Tim Schoolfield, St.Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Council, Keith Taylor, Keith Taylor, Keith Taylor, Keith Taylor, Mike Weis, Tim Wies. (Campbell, Greg)
October 3, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Default Judgment by Plaintiffs Dan Barger, Robert Behlman, Mark Boehms, Albert Bond, Albert Bond, Albert Bond, Albert Bond, Donald J. Brussel, Jr, Donald J. Brussel, Jr, Donald J. Brussell, Jr, Scott Byrne, Scott Byrne, Scott Byrne, Scott Byrne, Robert Calhoun, Robert Calhoun, Robert Calhoun, Carpenters' Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters' Joint Training Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters' Pension Trust Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters' Vacation Trust Fund of St. Louis, James Carson, James Carson, James Carson, Kevin Deptula, Kevin Deptula, Kevin Deptula, Kevin Deptula, John Gaal, Todd Hake, Todd Hake, Todd Hake, Todd Hake, Mike Hart, Greg Hesser, Greg Hesser, Greg Hesser, Dennis Joyce, Dennis Joyce, Dennis Joyce, Kent Kiefner, Rocky Kloth, Rocky Kloth, Rocky Kloth, Rocky Kloth, Craig McPartlin, Craig McPartlin, Craig McPartlin, Dan Neiswander, Dan Neiswander, Dan Neiswander, Tod O'Donaghue, Tod O'Donaghue, Tod O'Donaghue, Jim Sauer, Jim Sauer, Jim Sauer, Tim Schoolfield, Tim Schoolfield, Tim Schoolfield, St.Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Council, Keith Taylor, Keith Taylor, Keith Taylor, Keith Taylor, Mike Weis, Tim Wies. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Greg A. Campbell, #2 Affidavit of Juli Laramie, #3 Exhibit 1A to Laramie Aff, #4 Exhibit 1B to Laramie Aff, #5 Exhibit 2 to Laramie Aff, #6 Exhibit 3 to Laramie Aff, #7 Proposed Judgment)(Campbell, Greg)
October 3, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Entry of Clerk's Default against Richard Kotva d/b/a TL Vinyard & Associates by Plaintiffs Dan Barger, Robert Behlman, Mark Boehms, Albert Bond, Albert Bond, Albert Bond, Albert Bond, Donald J. Brussel, Jr, Donald J. Brussel, Jr, Donald J. Brussell, Jr, Scott Byrne, Scott Byrne, Scott Byrne, Scott Byrne, Robert Calhoun, Robert Calhoun, Robert Calhoun, Carpenters' Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters' Joint Training Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters' Pension Trust Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters' Vacation Trust Fund of St. Louis, James Carson, James Carson, James Carson, Kevin Deptula, Kevin Deptula, Kevin Deptula, Kevin Deptula, John Gaal, Todd Hake, Todd Hake, Todd Hake, Todd Hake, Mike Hart, Greg Hesser, Greg Hesser, Greg Hesser, Dennis Joyce, Dennis Joyce, Dennis Joyce, Kent Kiefner, Rocky Kloth, Rocky Kloth, Rocky Kloth, Rocky Kloth, Craig McPartlin, Craig McPartlin, Craig McPartlin, Dan Neiswander, Dan Neiswander, Dan Neiswander, Tod O'Donaghue, Tod O'Donaghue, Tod O'Donaghue, Jim Sauer, Jim Sauer, Jim Sauer, Tim Schoolfield, Tim Schoolfield, Tim Schoolfield, St.Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Council, Keith Taylor, Keith Taylor, Keith Taylor, Keith Taylor, Mike Weis, Tim Wies. (Attachments: #1 Entry of Default by the Clerk)(Campbell, Greg) Forwarded to Clerk of Court/Chief Deputy on 10/4/2019 (JAB).
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Greg Hesser(in their representative capacities as Trustees of the CARPENTERS' HEALTH AND WELFARE TRUST FUND OF ST. LOUIS), Carpenters' Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis, Mike Weis, Rocky Kloth, Scott Byrne, Tod O'Donaghue, Donald J. Brussel, Jr, Carpenters' Pension Trust Fund of St. Louis, Robert Calhoun, Keith Taylor, Dan Barger, James Carson, Todd Hake, Tim Schoolfield, Mike Hart, Kevin Deptula, Carpenters' Vacation Trust Fund of St. Louis, Dennis Joyce, John Gaal, Greg Hesser(in their representative capacities as Trustees of the Carpenters' Pension Trust Fund of St. Louis), Kent Kiefner, Tim Wies, Dan Neiswander, Mark Boehms, Carpenters' Joint Training Fund of St. Louis, Albert Bond, St.Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Council, Jim Sauer, Craig McPartlin, Robert Behlman, Greg Hesser(in their representative capacities as Trustees of the CARPENTERS' VACATION TRUST FUND OF ST. LOUIS), Donald J. Brussell, Jr. Richard Kotva served on 8/24/2019. (Campbell, Greg)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs Dan Barger, Robert Behlman, Mark Boehms, Albert Bond, Albert Bond, Albert Bond, Albert Bond, Donald Jr. Brussel, Donald Jr. Brussel, Donald J. Brussell, Jr, Scott Byrne, Scott Byrne, Scott Byrne, Scott Byrne, Robert Calhoun, Robert Calhoun, Robert Calhoun, Carpenters' Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters' Joint Training Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters' Pension Trust Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters' Vacation Trust Fund of St. Louis, James Carson, James Carson, James Carson, Kevin Deptula, Kevin Deptula, Kevin Deptula, Kevin Deptula, John Gaal, Todd Hake, Todd Hake, Todd Hake, Todd Hake, Mike Hart, Greg Hesser, Greg Hesser, Greg Hesser, Dennis Joyce, Dennis Joyce, Dennis Joyce, Kent Kiefner, Rocky Kloth, Rocky Kloth, Rocky Kloth, Rocky Kloth, Craig McPartlin, Craig McPartlin, Craig McPartlin, Dan Neiswander, Dan Neiswander, Dan Neiswander, Tod O'Donaghue, Tod O'Donaghue, Tod O'Donaghue, Jim Sauer, Jim Sauer, Jim Sauer, Tim Schoolfield, Tim Schoolfield, Tim Schoolfield, St.Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Council, Keith Taylor, Keith Taylor, Keith Taylor, Keith Taylor, Mike Weis, Tim Wies Process Server: Frederick Investigations, Inc. (Campbell, Greg)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Richard Kotva, TL VINYARD & ASSOCIATES with receipt number AMOEDC-7397246, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Greg Hesser(in their representative capacities as Trustees of the CARPENTERS' HEALTH AND WELFARE TRUST FUND OF ST. LOUIS), Carpenters' Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis, Mike Weis, Rocky Kloth, Scott Byrne, Tod O'Donaghue, Donald Jr. Brussel, Carpenters' Pension Trust Fund of St. Louis, Robert Calhoun, Keith Taylor, Dan Barger, James Carson, Todd Hake, Tim Schoolfield, Mike Hart, Kevin Deptula, Carpenters' Vacation Trust Fund of St. Louis, Dennis Joyce, John Gaal, Greg Hesser(in their representative capacities as Trustees of the Carpenters' Pension Trust Fund of St. Louis), Kent Kiefner, Tim Wies, Dan Neiswander, Mark Boehms, Carpenters' Joint Training Fund of St. Louis, Albert Bond, St.Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Council, Jim Sauer, Craig McPartlin, Robert Behlman, Greg Hesser(in their representative capacities as Trustees of the CARPENTERS' VACATION TRUST FUND OF ST. LOUIS), Donald J. Brussell, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons)(Campbell, Greg)
August 14, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to attorney Greg Campbell. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Stephen R. Clark. (BAK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: St.Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Council et al v. Kotva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Gaal
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Barger
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Calhoun
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rocky Kloth
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Neiswander
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Joyce
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carpenters' Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Behlman
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig McPartlin
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Hake
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg Hesser
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St.Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Council
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Hart
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Deptula
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Wies
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Carson
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kent Kiefner
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Weis
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Bond
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Byrne
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carpenters' Pension Trust Fund of St. Louis
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald J. Brussel, Jr.
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald J. Brussell, Jr.
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tod O'Donaghue
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carpenters' Joint Training Fund of St. Louis
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Schoolfield
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Taylor
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Boehms
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carpenters' Vacation Trust Fund of St. Louis
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jim Sauer
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Kotva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?