Porter v. Porter
Plaintiff: Angela Porter and Angela L. Porter
Defendant: Carmody MacDonald P. David R Porter and David R. Porter
Case Number: 4:2019cv02350
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Shirley Padmore Mensah
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18:1030
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM Joint Proposed Plan for Handling Electronically Stored Information by Plaintiff Angela L. Porter. (Pupillo, Teresa)
October 9, 2019 Filing 24 REPLY to Response to Motion re #20 MOTION to Dismiss Case Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint or, in the Alternative, for More Definite Statement and Motion to Strike Request for Punitive Damages filed by Defendant David R. Porter. (Babel, Tina)
October 2, 2019 Filing 23 RESPONSE to Motion re #20 MOTION to Dismiss Case Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint or, in the Alternative, for More Definite Statement and Motion to Strike Request for Punitive Damages filed by Plaintiff Angela L. Porter. (Pupillo, Teresa)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant David R. Porter. (Babel, Tina) filed by David R. Porter. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant David R. Porter's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Petition (Doc. 8) is DENIED as moot, in light of the filing of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah on 9/30/19. (ARL)
September 25, 2019 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #20 MOTION to Dismiss Case Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint or, in the Alternative, for More Definite Statement and Motion to Strike Request for Punitive Damages filed by Defendant David R. Porter. (Babel, Tina)
September 25, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss Case Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint or, in the Alternative, for More Definite Statement and Motion to Strike Request for Punitive Damages by Defendant David R. Porter. (Babel, Tina)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution. This case is referred to: Mediation. Designation of Lead Counsel: Teresa D. Pupillo. ADR Completion Deadline due by 7/10/2020. ADR Compliance Report Deadline due by 7/27/2020. Designation of Neutral/Conference Report due by 6/1/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah on 9/16/19. (ARL)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - This case is assigned to Track: 2. Motion to Join Parties due by 12/18/2019. Discovery Completion due by 5/11/2020. ADR Future Reference 5/11/2020. Status Conference set for 4/23/2020 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah on 9/16/19. (ARL)
September 12, 2019 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY (no pdf attached) for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah: Rule 16 Conference held on 9/12/2019. Conference held in person. CMO to issue. (proceedings started: 10:55) (proceedings ended: 11:23) (NEP)
September 11, 2019 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant David R. Porter No Summons(es) issued, Waivers issued No, Consents issued No, Jury demand, , filed by Angela L. Porter.(Pupillo, Teresa)
September 6, 2019 Filing 15 FULL CONSENT has been received by Plaintiff Angela L. Porter, Defendant David R. Porter. (KEK)
September 5, 2019 Filing 14 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiff Angela L. Porter. . (Pupillo, Teresa)
September 4, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant David R. Porter. (Babel, Tina)
August 28, 2019 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by Stephen Mark Hoeplinger for Plaintiff Angela L. Porter. (Hoeplinger, Stephen)
August 28, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiff Angela L. Porter. (Pupillo, Teresa)
August 22, 2019 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Lindsay Leible Combs for Defendant David R. Porter. (Combs, Lindsay)
August 21, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant David R. Porter. (Babel, Tina)
August 21, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant David R. Porter. (Babel, Tina)
August 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant David R. Porter Sent To: State Court - Executed (Babel, Tina)
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RULE 16 ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 2 Joint Scheduling Plan due by 9/5/2019. Rule 16 Conference set for 9/12/2019 11:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 9/5/2019.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah on 8/15/2019. (NEP)
August 15, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: Honorable Shirley P. Mensah. (MFG)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENTAL State Court Docket Sheet. (MFG)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis County, filed by Angela L. Porter.(MFG)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant David R Porter Sent To: Plaintiff (Babel, Tina)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Twenty-First Judicial Circuit, St. Louis County, Missouri, case number 19SL-CC02736, with receipt number AMOEDC-7398406, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by David R Porter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Docket and Filings, #2 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Babel, Tina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Porter v. Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carmody MacDonald P. David R Porter
Represented By: Tina N. Babel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David R. Porter
Represented By: Tina N. Babel
Represented By: Lindsay Leible Combs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela L. Porter
Represented By: Stephen Mark Hoeplinger
Represented By: Teresa D. Pupillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?