Rosenbloom v. Vivint, Inc.
Plaintiff: Barbara Rosenbloom
Defendant: Vivint, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv02359
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen N Limbaugh
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Vivint, Inc..(Knepper, Matthew)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #7 Petition (Removal/Transfer) (Unopposed Request for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond) by Defendant Vivint, Inc.. (Knepper, Matthew) filed by Vivint, Inc. ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 08/23/19. (CMH)
August 22, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #7 Petition (Removal/Transfer) (Unopposed Request for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond) by Defendant Vivint, Inc.. (Knepper, Matthew)
August 20, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Vivint, Inc. Sent To: State Court - Executed (Knepper, Matthew)
August 16, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr.. (BAK)
August 16, 2019 Filing 7 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, St. Louis County, Missouri, filed by Barbara Rosenbloom.(BAK)
August 16, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Christopher E. Roberts for Plaintiff Barbara Rosenbloom. (Roberts, Christopher)
August 16, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Sarah Louise Zimmerman for Defendant Vivint, Inc.. (Zimmerman, Sarah)
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Matthew D. Knepper for Defendant Vivint, Inc.. (Knepper, Matthew)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Vivint, Inc.. Parent companies: Vivint, Inc. is a wholly owned subsidiary of Vivint Group, Inc. Vivint Group, Inc. is a wholly owned subsidiary of APX Group, Inc. APX Group, Inc. is a wholly owned subsidiary of APX Group Holdings, Inc., Publicly held company: APX Group Holdings, Inc.,. (Knepper, Matthew)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Vivint, Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (Knepper, Matthew)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for St. Louis County, Missouri, case number 19SL-CC02873, with receipt number AMOEDC-7402035, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Vivint, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Process Served on Vivint Inc., #2 Exhibit B - State Court File, #3 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal to State Court, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Original Filing Form)(Knepper, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rosenbloom v. Vivint, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vivint, Inc.
Represented By: Sarah Louise Zimmerman
Represented By: Matthew D. Knepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Rosenbloom
Represented By: Christopher E. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?