Principal National Life Insurance Company v. Rothenberg
Plaintiff: Principal National Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Donna T. Rothenberg
Case Number: 4:2019cv02360
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Jean C Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Principal National Life Insurance Company Donna T. Rothenberg waiver signed on 8/20/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. (Kersting, Edna)
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE Lawsuit: by Plaintiff Principal National Life Insurance Company (Kersting, Edna)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER of Service issued defendantDonna T. Rothenberg. sent to Donna T. Rothenberg on 08/20/2019 filed by Principal National Life Insurance Company. Waiver of Service due by 9/19/2019. (Kersting, Edna)
August 19, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Jean C. Hamilton. (MFG)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE Original Filing Form: by Plaintiff Principal National Life Insurance Company re #1 Complaint,, (Kersting, Edna)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Principal National Life Insurance Company.. (Kersting, Edna)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for declaratory judgment and relief against defendant Donna T. Rothenberg with receipt number AMOEDC-7402538, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Principal National Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Policy), #2 Exhibit B (Agreement and Acceptance of Delivery Form and Amendment and Acceptance Form), #3 Exhibit C (EFT Form), #4 Exhibit D (Death Certificate), #5 Exhibit E (Attorney Letter June 10, 2019), #6 Exhibit F (Response June 24, 2019), #7 Exhibit G (July 29, 2019 letter), #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kersting, Edna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Principal National Life Insurance Company v. Rothenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna T. Rothenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Principal National Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Edna S. Kersting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?