Window World International, LLC v. O'Toole
Plaintiff: Window World, Inc. and Window World International, LLC
Defendant: Jill O'Toole
Case Number: 4:2019cv02363
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen N Limbaugh
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Plaintiffs Window World International, LLC, Window World, Inc.. (Comerford, John) filed by Window World, Inc., Window World International, LLC; MOTION ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 10/8/19. (CSG)
October 7, 2019 Filing 17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Plaintiffs Window World International, LLC, Window World, Inc.. (Comerford, John)
October 2, 2019 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #15 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Jill O'Toole. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Lomax Declaration, #2 Exhibit O'Toole Declaration)(Rembusch, Jill)
October 2, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant Jill O'Toole. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Lomax Declaration, #2 Exhibit O'Toole Declaration)(Rembusch, Jill)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Joseph S. Goode. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-7448449) by Plaintiffs Window World International, LLC, Window World, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing Joseph S. Goode - Certificate of Good Standing)(Goode, Joseph) filed by Window World, Inc., Window World International, LLC ; MOTION ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 9/10/19. (CSG)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #10 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Jill O'Toole. (Rembusch, Jill) filed by Jill O'Toole; MOTION ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 9/9/19. (CSG)
September 9, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Joseph S. Goode. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-7448449) by Plaintiffs Window World International, LLC, Window World, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Joseph S. Goode - Certificate of Good Standing)(Goode, Joseph)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer until 10/7/19 by Defendant Jill O'Toole. (CSG) filed by Jill O'Toole ; MOTION ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 9/6/19. (CSG)
September 6, 2019 Filing 10 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Jill O'Toole. (Rembusch, Jill)
September 5, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer until 10/7/19 by Defendant Jill O'Toole. (CSG)
September 5, 2019 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Jill R. Rembusch for Defendant Jill O'Toole. (Rembusch, Jill)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Judson A. Welborn. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number BMOEDC-7439527) by Plaintiffs Window World International, LLC, Window World, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing Certificate of Good Standing)(Welborn, Judson) filed by Window World, Inc., Window World International, LLC; MOTION ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 9/5/19. (CSG)
September 4, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Judson A. Welborn. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number BMOEDC-7439527) by Plaintiffs Window World International, LLC, Window World, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Certificate of Good Standing)(Welborn, Judson)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Window World International, LLC, Window World, Inc.. Jill O'Toole served on 8/21/2019, answer due 9/11/2019. (Comerford, John)
August 19, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to John D. Comerford. Judge Assigned: Honorable Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr.. (MFG)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs Window World International, LLC, Window World, Inc. Process Server: Robert Thomure (Comerford, John)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Window World, Inc.. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Comerford, John)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Window World International, LLC. Parent companies: N/A, Subsidiaries: N/A, Publicly held company: N/A,. (Comerford, John)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number AMOEDC-7403385, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Window World International, LLC, Window World, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Original Filing Form, #6 Summons)(Comerford, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Window World International, LLC v. O'Toole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Window World, Inc.
Represented By: John D. Comerford
Represented By: Judson A Welborn
Represented By: Joseph S Goode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Window World International, LLC
Represented By: John D. Comerford
Represented By: Judson A Welborn
Represented By: Joseph S Goode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jill O'Toole
Represented By: Jill R. Rembusch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?