Gerwitz et al v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Mary Kate Nelson, Terry English, Lisa Kalfayan, Christina Morales, Craig Silliven, Tanya Lairamore, Janice Gerwitz, Joann Hemmerling, Vivienne Gonzalez, Linda Mogan, Mary Gist, Lynette James, Spring McClendon-Mitchell, Myra Liddell, Michael Gudas, Sharon Cramer, Robert Bogaczyk, Lynda Brace, Shelby Ramirez Martinez, Reginae Cook, Joe Morales, Jr., Karen Fitz and Leah Solorio-Fimbrez
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson, PTI Union, LLC, PTI Royston, LLC and Johnson & Johnson, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv02453
Filed: August 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Jean C Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 ***REMARK - Case transferred from Missouri Eastern has been opened in District of New Jersey as case 3:19-cv-18592, filed 10/01/2019. (DLB)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER OF MDL TRANSFER to: District of New Jersey. Case transferred via CM/ECF extraction. (DLB)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER LIFTING STAY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. A conditional transfer order was filed in this action (Gerwitz) on September 5, 2019. Prior to expiration of that orders 7-day stay of transmittal, plaintiffs in Gerwitz filed a notice of opposition to the proposed transfer. Plaintiffs subsequently failed to file the required motion and brief to vacate the conditional transfer order. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the stay of the Panel's conditional transfer order designated as CTO-165 filed on September 5, 2019, is LIFTED insofar as it relates to this action. The action is transferred to the District of New Jersey for inclusion in the coordinated orconsolidated pretrial proceedings under 28 U.S.C. 1407 being conducted by the Honorable Freda L. Wolfson. (DLB)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #24 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation Specially-Appearing Defendant PTI Royston, LLC's Motion for Leave to File its Memorandum of Law in Support of its Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim in Excess of the Page Limitation by Defendant PTI Royston, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Specially-Appearing Defendant PTI Royston, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Petition for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F - to be submitted under seal, # 8 Exhibit G)(Tinsley, Caroline) filed by PTI Royston, LLC, #28 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation Defendant PTI Union, LLC's Motion for Leave to File its Memorandum in Support of its Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim in Excess of the Page Limitation by Defendant PTI Union, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Defendant PTI Union, LLC's Memorandum of Law in Support of its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Petition for Failure to State a Claim, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Tinsley, Caroline) filed by PTI Union, LLC, #25 MOTION to Seal Document Specially-Appearing Defendant PTI Royston, LLC's Motion to File Exhibit F to its Memorandum in Support of its Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim under Seal by Defendant PTI Royston, LLC. (Tinsley, Caroline) filed by PTI Royston, LLC ; GRANTED.. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 9/6/19. (JMP)
September 5, 2019 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #29 MOTION to Sever Claims and Motion to Transfer for Improper Venue filed by Defendant PTI Union, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Tinsley, Caroline)
September 5, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION to Sever Claims and Motion to Transfer for Improper Venue by Defendant PTI Union, LLC. (Tinsley, Caroline)
September 5, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation Defendant PTI Union, LLC's Motion for Leave to File its Memorandum in Support of its Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim in Excess of the Page Limitation by Defendant PTI Union, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Defendant PTI Union, LLC's Memorandum of Law in Support of its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Petition for Failure to State a Claim, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Tinsley, Caroline)
September 5, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss Party Defendant PTI Union, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Petition for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant PTI Union, LLC. (Tinsley, Caroline)
September 5, 2019 Filing 26 SEALED DOCUMENT re #25 MOTION to Seal Document Specially-Appearing Defendant PTI Royston, LLC's Motion to File Exhibit F to its Memorandum in Support of its Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim under Seal : Exhibit F by Defendant PTI Royston, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Tinsley, Caroline)
September 5, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION to Seal Document Specially-Appearing Defendant PTI Royston, LLC's Motion to File Exhibit F to its Memorandum in Support of its Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim under Seal by Defendant PTI Royston, LLC. (Tinsley, Caroline)
September 5, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation Specially-Appearing Defendant PTI Royston, LLC's Motion for Leave to File its Memorandum of Law in Support of its Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim in Excess of the Page Limitation by Defendant PTI Royston, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Specially-Appearing Defendant PTI Royston, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Petition for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F - to be submitted under seal, #8 Exhibit G)(Tinsley, Caroline)
September 5, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Specially-Appearing Defendant PTI Royston, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Petition for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim by Defendant PTI Royston, LLC. (Tinsley, Caroline)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #21 MOTION for Joinder in Johnson & Johnson Defendants' Motion to Stay All Proceedings by Defendant PTI Union, LLC. (Tinsley, Caroline) filed by PTI Union, LLC, #18 MOTION for Joinder in Johnson & Johnson Defendants' Motion to Stay All Proceedings by Defendant PTI Royston, LLC. (Tinsley, Caroline) filed by PTI Royston, LLC ; JOINDER GRANTED.. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 09/03/2019. (AAS)
August 30, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Joinder in Johnson & Johnson Defendants' Motion to Stay All Proceedings by Defendant PTI Union, LLC. (Tinsley, Caroline)
August 30, 2019 Filing 20 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant PTI Union, LLC.. (Tinsley, Caroline)
August 30, 2019 Filing 19 ENTRY of Appearance by Caroline M. Tinsley for Defendant PTI Union, LLC. (Tinsley, Caroline)
August 30, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Joinder in Johnson & Johnson Defendants' Motion to Stay All Proceedings by Defendant PTI Royston, LLC. (Tinsley, Caroline)
August 30, 2019 Filing 17 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant PTI Royston, LLC.. (Tinsley, Caroline)
August 30, 2019 Filing 16 ENTRY of Appearance by Caroline M. Tinsley for Defendant PTI Royston, LLC. (Tinsley, Caroline)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #4 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation by Defendants Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Rankin, W.) filed by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc. ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 8/30/19. (KJS)
August 30, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Jean C. Hamilton. (MFG)
August 30, 2019 Filing 14 SUPPLEMENTAL State Court Docket Sheet. (MFG)
August 29, 2019 Filing 13 Consent to Removal by Defendant PTI Royston, LLC. (MFG)
August 29, 2019 Filing 12 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis City, filed by Joe Morales, Jr., Leah Solorio-Fimbrez, Michael Gudas, Mary Gist, Lynda Brace, Shelby Ramirez Martinez, Janice Gerwitz, Lynette James, Craig Silliven, Robert Bogaczyk, Reginae Cook, Vivienne Gonzalez, Sharon Cramer, Linda Mogan, Mary Kate Nelson, Joann Hemmerling, Lisa Kalfayan, Myra Liddell, Spring McClendon-Mitchell, Terry English, Tanya Lairamore, Christina Morales, Karen Fitz.(MFG)
August 29, 2019 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc... (Rankin, W.)
August 29, 2019 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Johnson & Johnson.. (Rankin, W.)
August 29, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #8 MOTION to Stay all Proceedings filed by Defendants Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Rankin, W.)
August 29, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Stay all Proceedings by Defendants Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Rankin, W.)
August 29, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc..(Rankin, W.)
August 29, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue filed by Defendants Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Rankin, W.)
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue by Defendants Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Rankin, W.)
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation by Defendants Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Rankin, W.)
August 29, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (Rankin, W.)
August 29, 2019 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Beth A. Bauer for Defendants Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Bauer, Beth)
August 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of the City of St. Louis, case number 1922-CC11022, with receipt number AMOEDC-7428654, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Original Filing Form)(Rankin, W.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gerwitz et al v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Kate Nelson
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry English
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Kalfayan
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Morales
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Silliven
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanya Lairamore
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Gerwitz
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joann Hemmerling
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vivienne Gonzalez
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Mogan
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Gist
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynette James
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spring McClendon-Mitchell
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myra Liddell
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Gudas
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Cramer
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Bogaczyk
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynda Brace
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelby Ramirez Martinez
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginae Cook
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Morales, Jr.
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Fitz
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leah Solorio-Fimbrez
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.
Represented By: Beth A. Bauer
Represented By: W. Jason Rankin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Beth A. Bauer
Represented By: W. Jason Rankin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PTI Union, LLC
Represented By: Caroline M. Tinsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PTI Royston, LLC
Represented By: Caroline M. Tinsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson, Inc.
Represented By: Beth A. Bauer
Represented By: W. Jason Rankin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?