etrailer Corporation v. TexTrail, Inc.
Plaintiff: etrailer Corporation
Defendant: TexTrail, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv02490
Filed: September 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Filing 19 SURREPLY to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Case (Count II) of Complaint filed by Plaintiff etrailer Corporation. (Kelly, Don)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Its Answer to Count I of Plaintiff etrailer Corporation's Complaint is GRANTED. [Doc. 10.] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to file Short Sur-reply in Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Count II of the Complaint is GRANTED. [Doc. 14.] Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on October 29, 2019. (EMM)
October 29, 2019 Filing 17 FULL CONSENT has been received by Defendant TexTrail, Inc., Plaintiff etrailer Corporation. (AAS)
October 25, 2019 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #14 MOTION for Leave to File Short Sur-Reply in Response to Motion to Dismiss Count II of Complaint filed by Defendant TexTrail, Inc.. (Meyer, Jason)
October 24, 2019 Filing 15 ENTRY of Appearance by Brian R. Shank for Plaintiff etrailer Corporation. (Shank, Brian)
October 23, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to File Short Sur-Reply in Response to Motion to Dismiss Count II of Complaint by Plaintiff etrailer Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Sur-Reply Opposition)(Kelly, Don)
October 21, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Case (Count II) filed by Defendant TexTrail, Inc.. (Meyer, Jason)
October 14, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Case (Count II) filed by Plaintiff etrailer Corporation. (Kelly, Don)
October 7, 2019 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Matthew G. Minder for Defendant TexTrail, Inc.. (Minder, Matthew)
October 7, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendant TexTrail, Inc.. (Meyer, Jason)
October 7, 2019 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant TexTrail, Inc.. Parent companies: Big Tex Trailer Manufacturing, Inc., Subsidiaries: Nuera Transport, Inc., Publicly held company: None,. (Meyer, Jason)
October 7, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Case (Count II) filed by Defendant TexTrail, Inc.. (Meyer, Jason)
October 7, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Case (Count II) by Defendant TexTrail, Inc.. (Meyer, Jason)
September 30, 2019 Notice from Clerk instructing Plaintiff etrailer Corporation to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 10/7/2019. (KJS)
September 20, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by etrailer Corporation. TexTrail, Inc. served on 9/16/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (Kelly, Don)
September 6, 2019 Filing 5 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
September 6, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to Don V. Kelly. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Nannette A. Baker. (MFG)
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT to Commissioner of filing or determination of an action regarding copyright. (MFG)
September 5, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff etrailer Corporation.. (Kelly, Don)
September 5, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff etrailer Corporation (Kelly, Don)
September 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT etrailer Corporation against defendant TexTrail, Inc. with receipt number AMOEDC-7441603, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by etrailer Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form, #5 Summons Summons, #6 Summons Summons copy)(Kelly, Don)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: etrailer Corporation v. TexTrail, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TexTrail, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: etrailer Corporation
Represented By: Don V. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?