Flanigan v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Barbara Flanigan
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 4:2019cv02532
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Henry Edward Autrey
Referring Judge: Noelle C Collins
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the scheduling conference pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 16 set for November 13, 2019, is vacated. The Case Management Order will be issued based on the dates provided by the parties in their Joint Proposed Scheduling Plan.. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 11/08/2019. (AAS)
November 6, 2019 Filing 17 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. . (Stubbs, Kara)
October 24, 2019 Filing 16 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. Parent companies: Becton, Dickinson and Company, Subsidiaries: C. R. Bard, Inc. and Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., Publicly held company: Becton, Dickinson and Company,. (Stubbs, Kara)
October 23, 2019 Filing 15 ENTRY of Appearance by Laura J Baughman for Plaintiff Barbara Flanigan. (Baughman, Laura)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AMENDED ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CONFERENCE - See Order For Full Details - Joint Scheduling Plan due by 11/6/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 11/13/2019 02:00 PM in Telephone before District Judge Henry Edward Autrey.. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 10/22/2019. (AAS)
October 9, 2019 Filing 13 CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Henry Edward Autrey for all further proceedings. (TMT)
October 3, 2019 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by John Andrew Wharton for Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Wharton, John)
October 3, 2019 Notice from Clerk instructing Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated, Plaintiff Barbara Flanigan to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 10/10/2019. (KCB)
October 2, 2019 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Tomas Leonard for Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Leonard, Tomas)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion to Withdraw (Doc. #8 ) is GRANTED. Attorney Richard B. North, Jr. is terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 09/27/2019. (KBL)
September 25, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Lori G. Cohen. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-7483260) by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 List of Bar Memberships, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Cohen, Lori)
September 20, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Richard B. North, Jr. by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Stubbs, Kara)
September 19, 2019 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Kara T. Stubbs for Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Stubbs, Kara)
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
September 10, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: Honorable Noelle C. Collins. (DLB)
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-01635. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case transferred in electronically.(DLB)
September 9, 2019 Remark: Transferring Case to the Eastern District of Missouri via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED SCHEDULES FOR CASES TO BE TRANSFERRED OR REMANDED re: #3 . Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/26/19. (SLQ)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/19/19. (MAP)
March 11, 2019 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-19-01635-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ)
March 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16632182 filed by Barbara Flanigan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SLQ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flanigan v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: John Andrew Wharton
Represented By: Lori Gail Cohen
Represented By: Tomas Leonard
Represented By: Kara T. Stubbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: John Andrew Wharton
Represented By: Lori Gail Cohen
Represented By: Tomas Leonard
Represented By: Kara T. Stubbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Flanigan
Represented By: Thomas William Arbon
Represented By: Ben C Martin
Represented By: Laura J Baughman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?