Stromquist v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Terry Stromquist
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 4:2019cv02536
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: John A Ross
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Following a telephone conference with counsel, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that within ten (10) days from the date of this Order, the parties shall meet and confer and submit to the Court a proposed scheduling plan addressing additional discovery, dispositive motions and trial. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 11/8/19. (JAB)
November 8, 2019 Filing 16 ENTRY of Appearance by Laura Greene Lumaghi for Plaintiff Terry Stromquist. (Lumaghi, Laura)
October 23, 2019 Filing 15 ENTRY of Appearance by Laura J Baughman for Plaintiff Terry Stromquist. (Baughman, Laura)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a joint status conference by telephone is set in this matter for Friday, November 8, 2019 at 11:30 a.m. Counsel participating in the telephone conference are directed to call the conference toll free at 1-877-810-9415. The access code to enter the telephone conference for all participants is: 7519116.. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 10/4/19. (KKS)
October 3, 2019 Filing 13 ENTRY of Appearance by John Andrew Wharton for Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Wharton, John)
October 2, 2019 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by Tomas Leonard for Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Leonard, Tomas)
September 26, 2019 ***REMARK - IT IS NOT NECESSARY TO FILE PRO HAC MOTIONS IN THESE CASES SINCE THEY ARE PART OF AN MDL CASE. ATTORNEY HAS BEEN NOTIFIED AND THE PRO HAC FEES WILL BE REFUNDED. (KXS)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Lori G. Cohen by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Cohen, Lori) ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 9/26/19. (JAB)
September 25, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Lori G. Cohen. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-7483277) by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 List of Bar Memberships, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Cohen, Lori)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #7 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Richard B. North, Jr. by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Stubbs, Kara) ; ORDERED GRANTED, Attorney Richard B. North, Jr terminated. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 9/24/2019. (CLO)
September 23, 2019 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by William T. Dowd for Plaintiff Terry Stromquist. (Dowd, William)
September 20, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Richard B. North, Jr. by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Stubbs, Kara)
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Kara T. Stubbs for Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Stubbs, Kara)
September 10, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable John A. Ross. (DLB)
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-01314. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case transferred in electronically.(DLB)
September 9, 2019 Remark: Transferring Case to the Eastern District of Missouri via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED SCHEDULES FOR CASES TO BE TRANSFERRED OR REMANDED re: #3 . Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/26/19. (SLQ)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/19/19. (MAP)
February 25, 2019 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-19-01314-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ)
February 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16577415 filed by Terry Stromquist. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SLQ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stromquist v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Stromquist
Represented By: Thomas William Arbon
Represented By: Ben C Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?