Schulte v. Conopco, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Karen Schulte
Defendant: Does 1 - 10, Conopco, Inc., Walgreen Co., Dierbergs Markets, Inc., Walmart, Inc., Target Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc. and Schnuck Markets, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv02546
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Rodney W Sippel
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Filing 34 REPLY to Response to Motion re #28 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court RESPONSE TO COURT'S ORDER OF OCTOBER 11, 2019 AND MOTION TO REMAND to MISSOURI STATE COURT filed by Plaintiff Karen Schulte. (Harvath, Daniel)
October 31, 2019 Filing 33 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #28 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court RESPONSE TO COURT'S ORDER OF OCTOBER 11, 2019 AND MOTION TO REMAND to MISSOURI STATE COURT on behalf of all Defendants filed by Defendants CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Conopco, Inc., Dierbergs Markets, Inc., Schnuck Markets, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration)(Muehlberger, James)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #31 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #28 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court RESPONSE TO COURT'S ORDER OF OCTOBER 11, 2019 AND MOTION TO REMAND to MISSOURI STATE COURT filed by Conopco, Inc., Schnuck Markets, Inc., CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Dierbergs Markets, Inc. ; GRANTED - SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 10/24/19. (KJS)
October 23, 2019 Filing 31 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #28 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court RESPONSE TO COURT'S ORDER OF OCTOBER 11, 2019 AND MOTION TO REMAND to MISSOURI STATE COURT by Defendants CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Conopco, Inc., Dierbergs Markets, Inc., Schnuck Markets, Inc.. (Muehlberger, James)
October 21, 2019 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #29 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Conopco, Inc., Dierbergs Markets, Inc., Schnuck Markets, Inc.. (Muehlberger, James)
October 21, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendants CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Conopco, Inc., Dierbergs Markets, Inc., Schnuck Markets, Inc.. (Muehlberger, James)
October 20, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court RESPONSE TO COURT'S ORDER OF OCTOBER 11, 2019 AND MOTION TO REMAND to MISSOURI STATE COURT by Plaintiff Karen Schulte. (Harvath, Daniel)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall each file a brief no later than October 31, 2019 addressing whether CAFA's jurisdictional exceptions under 28 U.S.C. 1332(d)(3) or 28 U.S.C. 1332(d)(4) apply to the present case. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 10/11/19. (KEK)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #25 Joint MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending the Court's Ruling on Motion(s) to Dismiss by Defendants CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Conopco, Inc., Dierbergs Markets, Inc., Schnuck Markets, Inc.. (Muehlberger, James) filed by Conopco, Inc., Schnuck Markets, Inc., CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Dierbergs Markets, Inc. ; ORDERED DENIED. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 9/23/2019. (NEP)
September 20, 2019 Filing 25 Joint MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending the Court's Ruling on Motion(s) to Dismiss by Defendants CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Conopco, Inc., Dierbergs Markets, Inc., Schnuck Markets, Inc.. (Muehlberger, James)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Docket Text ORDER: as to Target Corporation Re: #22 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Petition (Removal/Transfer) by Defendant Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bozarth, Troy) filed by Target Corporation ; ORDERED GRANTED, Target Corporation answer due 10/21/2019.Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 9/19/19. (ARL)
September 19, 2019 Filing 23 ENTRY of Appearance by LaDawn L. Burnett for Defendant Walmart, Inc.. (Burnett, LaDawn)
September 19, 2019 Filing 22 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Petition (Removal/Transfer) by Defendant Target Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bozarth, Troy)
September 19, 2019 Filing 21 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Target Corporation.. (Bozarth, Troy)
September 19, 2019 Filing 20 ENTRY of Appearance by Troy A. Bozarth for Defendant Target Corporation. (Bozarth, Troy)
September 19, 2019 Filing 19 ENTRY of Appearance by Darci F. Madden for Defendant Walmart, Inc.. (Madden, Darci)
September 19, 2019 Filing 18 ENTRY of Appearance by Ann E. Sternhell-Blackwell for Defendant Walmart, Inc.. (Sternhell-Blackwell, Ann)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #16 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Petition (Removal/Transfer) and Entry of Briefing Schedule by Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Muehlberger, James) filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., #14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Defendant Walmart's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Walmart, Inc.. (Madden, Darci) filed by Walmart, Inc. ; ORDERED GRANTED. Up to and including 10/21/19. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 9/19/19. (ARL)
September 18, 2019 Filing 16 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Petition (Removal/Transfer) and Entry of Briefing Schedule by Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Muehlberger, James)
September 18, 2019 Filing 15 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Walmart, Inc... (Madden, Darci)
September 18, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Defendant Walmart's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Walmart, Inc.. (Madden, Darci)
September 18, 2019 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. Parent companies: CVS Health Corporation, Subsidiaries: Red Oak Sourcing, LLC, Publicly held company: None,. (Muehlberger, James)
September 18, 2019 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by James Muehlberger for Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Muehlberger, James)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #10 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Petition (Removal/Transfer) and Entry of Briefing Schedule by Defendants Conopco, Inc., Dierbergs Markets, Inc., Schnuck Markets, Inc. (Muehlberger, James) filed by Conopco, Inc., Schnuck Markets, Inc., Dierbergs Markets, Inc.; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 9/18/19. (KEK)
September 13, 2019 Filing 10 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Petition (Removal/Transfer) and Entry of Briefing Schedule by Defendants Conopco, Inc., Dierbergs Markets, Inc., Schnuck Markets, Inc.. (Muehlberger, James)
September 13, 2019 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Schnuck Markets, Inc.. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Muehlberger, James)
September 13, 2019 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Dierbergs Markets, Inc.. Parent companies: Dierbergs Investment Corp., Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Muehlberger, James)
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by James Muehlberger for Defendant Schnuck Markets, Inc.. (Muehlberger, James)
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by James Muehlberger for Defendant Dierbergs Markets, Inc.. (Muehlberger, James)
September 12, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Rodney W. Sippel. (BAK)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, Jefferson County, Missouri, filed by Karen Schulte.(BAK)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Conopco, Inc. Sent To: State Court - Executed (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Acknowledgment)(Muehlberger, James)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Conopco, Inc.. Parent companies: Unilever United States, Inc., Subsidiaries: Trumbull Research Services, Inc.; Sundial Brands, LLC, Publicly held company: Unilever PLC; Unilever NV,. (Muehlberger, James)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Conopco, Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (Muehlberger, James)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 23rd Judicial Circuit - Jefferson County, case number 19JE-CC00485, with receipt number AMOEDC-7456067, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Conopco, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court File, #3 Original Filing Form, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Muehlberger, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schulte v. Conopco, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 - 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conopco, Inc.
Represented By: James Muehlberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dierbergs Markets, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schnuck Markets, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Schulte
Represented By: Daniel F. Harvath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?