Schulte v. Colgate-Palmolive Company et al
Plaintiff: Karen Schulte
Defendant: Walgreen CO., Dierbergs Markets, Inc., Colgate-Palmolive Company, Walmart, Inc., Target Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc. and Schnuck Markets, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv02552
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Henry Edward Autrey
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #27 Consent MOTION for Extension of: Time and Entry of Briefing Schedule by Defendant Colgate-Palmolive Company. (Spelman, Kate) filed by Colgate-Palmolive Company ; GRANTED. SO ORDERED AS REFLECTED IN DOCUMENT #27 .. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 11/4/19. (KJS)
November 1, 2019 Filing 27 Consent MOTION for Extension of: Time and Entry of Briefing Schedule by Defendant Colgate-Palmolive Company. (Spelman, Kate)
October 2, 2019 Filing 26 Summons Issued as to defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. The summons was emailed to DANIEL F. HARVATH. (AAS)
October 2, 2019 Filing 25 Summons Issued as to defendant Dierbergs Markets, Inc.. The summons was emailed to DANIEL F. HARVATH. (AAS)
October 2, 2019 Filing 24 Summons Issued as to defendant Target Corporation. The summons was emailed to DANIEL F. HARVATH. (AAS)
October 2, 2019 Filing 23 Summons Issued as to defendant Schnuck Markets, Inc.. The summons was emailed to DANIEL F. HARVATH. (AAS)
October 2, 2019 Filing 22 Summons Issued as to defendant Walgreen CO.. The summons was emailed to DANIEL F. HARVATH. (AAS)
October 1, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Karen Schulte Process Server: COLE COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE (Attachments: #1 Summons FOR WALGREEN CO.)(Harvath, Daniel)
October 1, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Karen Schulte Process Server: ST. LOUIS CITY SHERIFF'S OFFICE (Attachments: #1 Summons FOR SCHNUCK MARKETS, INC.)(Harvath, Daniel)
October 1, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Karen Schulte Process Server: ST. LOUIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE (Attachments: #1 Summons FOR CVS, INC., #2 Summons FOR DIERBERGS MARKETS, INC., #3 Summons FOR TARGET CORPORATION)(Harvath, Daniel)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Kate T. Spelman. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-7491772) by Defendant Colgate-Palmolive Company. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Spelman, Kate) filed by Colgate-Palmolive Company, #16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Dean N. Panos. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-7491824) by Defendant Colgate-Palmolive Company. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Panos, Dean) filed by Colgate-Palmolive Company ; GRANTED. SO ORDERED.. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 10/01/2019. (AAS)
September 30, 2019 Filing 17 ENTRY of Appearance by LaDawn L. Burnett for Defendant Walmart, Inc.. (Burnett, LaDawn)
September 30, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Dean N. Panos. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-7491824) by Defendant Colgate-Palmolive Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Panos, Dean)
September 30, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Kate T. Spelman. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-7491772) by Defendant Colgate-Palmolive Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Spelman, Kate)
September 27, 2019 Filing 14 ENTRY of Appearance by Darci F. Madden for Defendant Walmart, Inc.. (Madden, Darci)
September 27, 2019 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Walmart, Inc... (Sternhell-Blackwell, Ann)
September 27, 2019 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by Ann E. Sternhell-Blackwell for Defendant Walmart, Inc.. (Sternhell-Blackwell, Ann)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #10 Consent MOTION for Extension of: Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Petition by Defendant Colgate-Palmolive Company. (Pake, Lisa) filed by Colgate-Palmolive Company ; GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 09/18/2019. (AAS)
September 17, 2019 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of: Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Petition by Defendant Colgate-Palmolive Company. (Pake, Lisa)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #2 MOTION to Seal Document - Motion to Seal Notice of Removal and Supporting Declaration by Defendant Colgate-Palmolive Company. (Pake, Lisa) filed by Colgate-Palmolive Company ; GRANTED. SO ORDERED.. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 09/13/2019. (AAS)
September 13, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Henry E. Autrey. (MFG)
September 13, 2019 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENTAL State Court Docket Sheet. (MFG)
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of Jefferson County, filed by Karen Schulte.(MFG)
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Colgate-Palmolive Company Sent To: State Court - Executed (Pake, Lisa)
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Colgate-Palmolive Company Sent To: Plaintiff (Pake, Lisa)
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Colgate-Palmolive Company. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: Colgate-Palmolive (Gulf States) Ltd.; Colgate-Palmolive (India) Limited; Colgate-Palmolive Arabia Ltd.; Colgate-Palmolive Cameroun S.A.; Hawley & Hazel (BVI) Company Ltd.; P.T. Colgate Palmolive Indonesia, Publicly held company: None,. (Pake, Lisa)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 SEALED DOCUMENT re #2 MOTION to Seal Document - Motion to Seal Notice of Removal and Supporting Declaration by Defendant Colgate-Palmolive Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B - Declaration of Brian Keough)(Pake, Lisa)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Seal Document - Motion to Seal Notice of Removal and Supporting Declaration by Defendant Colgate-Palmolive Company. (Pake, Lisa)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Jefferson County Circuit Court, case number 19JE-CC00487, with receipt number AMOEDC-7458277, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Colgate-Palmolive Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Filings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form)(Pake, Lisa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schulte v. Colgate-Palmolive Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Schulte
Represented By: Daniel F. Harvath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dierbergs Markets, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colgate-Palmolive Company
Represented By: Lisa A. Pake
Represented By: Kate Spelman
Represented By: Dean N. Panos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Represented By: Darci F. Madden
Represented By: LaDawn L. Burnett
Represented By: Ann E. Sternhell-Blackwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schnuck Markets, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?