Crayton v. Sinn
Plaintiff: Desiree Crayton
Defendant: Jessica Sinn
Case Number: 4:2019cv02567
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Filing 8 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Defendant Jessica Sinn. Joint Proposed Scheduling Plan. (Woolf, Richard)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 TELEPHONE CONFERENCE - See Order For Full Details - Joint Scheduling Plan due by 11/4/2019. Rule 16 Conference set for 11/13/2019 10:45 AM in Telephone before District Judge Jean C. Hamilton.. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 10/09/2019. (AAS)
September 18, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint Defendant Jessica Sinn's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Petition by Jessica Sinn.(Woolf, Richard)
September 18, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Shatrasha LeighAnn Stone for Defendant Jessica Sinn. (Stone, Shatrasha)
September 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Jessica Sinn Sent To: State Court - Executed (Woolf, Richard)
September 16, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Jean C. Hamilton. (BAK)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, City of St. Louis, filed by Desiree Crayton.(BAK)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Jessica Sinn Sent To: Plaintiff (Woolf, Richard)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from City of St. Louis, case number 1922-CC10773, with receipt number AMOEDC-7460637, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Jessica Sinn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Original Filing Form)(Woolf, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crayton v. Sinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Sinn
Represented By: Richard I. Woolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Desiree Crayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?