Baalim v. United State of America et al
Plaintiff: Malak Baalim
Defendant: St. Peters Police Department, Judge Joel David Brett, MO State Highway Patrol, State of Missouri, St. Charles County Municipal Court, St. Charles County and United State of America
Case Number: 4:2019cv02569
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Audrey G Fleissig
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 5. Mailed to non-electronic party this date. Mon Nov 4 11:00:23 CST 2019 (Cordray, Abby)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff shall show cause in writing within ten (10) days as to why this case should not be dismissed. Plaintiff's failure to timely comply with this Order shall result in the dismissal of this action, without prejudice and without further notice. (Show Cause Response due by 11/14/2019.) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 11/4/2019. (AFC)
October 16, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Malak Baalim. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Envelope)(EAB)
October 3, 2019 Filing 3 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Malak Baalim, P.O. Box 552, St. Charles, MO 63302. Returned document(s): #1 Complaint. Could not verify new address and mail was not resent. (EAB)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 2. sent to non-electronic party this date Tue Oct 1 15:47:40 CDT 2019 (Berg, Melanie)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to send plaintiff an "Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs' form. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff must either pay the $400 filing fee or submit a motion to proceed without prepaying fees or costs within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to comply with this Order, the Court will dismiss this action without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on October 1, 2019. (Attachments: #1 Application to Proceed)(MCB)
September 16, 2019 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Mon Sep 16 11:00:48 CDT 2019 (admin,)
September 16, 2019 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (JWD)
September 16, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Audrey G. Fleissig. (JWD)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, Non-Jury Demand, filed by Malak Baalim. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JWD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baalim v. United State of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Peters Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Joel David Brett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MO State Highway Patrol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Charles County Municipal Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Charles County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United State of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malak Baalim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?