Karsten v. Target Corporation
Plaintiff: Tina Karsten
Defendant: Target Corporation
Case Number: 4:2019cv02575
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Clark
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CONFERENCE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following schedule shall apply: 1. Scheduling Conference: A Scheduling Conference, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, is set for Wednesday, December 4, 2019, at 1:30 p.m. in the chambers of Judge Stephen R. Clark. Lead trial counsel must appear for the conference in- person. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). (Joint Scheduling Plan due by 11/22/2019. Rule 16 Conference set for 12/4/2019 01:30 PM in Chambers before District Judge Stephen R. Clark.). Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 11/4/2019. (CLO)
September 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Target Corporation Sent To: State Court - Executed (Boggs, Beth)
September 16, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Stephen R. Clark. (BAK)
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, St. Louis County, Missouri, filed by Tina Karsten.(BAK)
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Target Corporation.(Boggs, Beth)
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Beth C. Boggs for Defendant Target Corporation. (Boggs, Beth)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Target Corporation.. (Boggs, Beth)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Target Corporation Sent To: Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Attachment Notice of Removal Documents)(Boggs, Beth)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis County Circuit Court, case number 19SL-CC03078, with receipt number AMOEDC-7462742, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Target Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Original Filing Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Attachment Court File from State Court)(Boggs, Beth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Karsten v. Target Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: Beth C. Boggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Karsten
Represented By: Bryan Joseph Sanger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?