Phillips et al v. PennyMac Loan Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Lleona Phillips and Calvin K Phillips
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A. and PennyMac Loan Services, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv02656
Filed: September 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen N Limbaugh
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Filing 8 CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr for all further proceedings. (KCB)
October 23, 2019 Notice from Clerk instructing Defendants Bank of America, N.A., PennyMac Loan Services, LLC, Plaintiffs Calvin K Phillips, Lleona Phillips to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 10/30/2019. (KCB)
September 30, 2019 Filing 7 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
September 30, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins. (BAK)
September 30, 2019 Filing 6 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, St. Louis County, Missouri, filed by Calvin K Phillips, Lleona Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14)(BAK)
September 30, 2019 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENTAL - State Court Docket Sheet. (BAK)
September 27, 2019 Filing 4 Consent to Removal by Defendant Bank of America, N.A.. (Wolf, Timothy)
September 27, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant PennyMac Loan Services, LLC Sent To: Plaintiff (Wolf, Timothy)
September 27, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant PennyMac Loan Services, LLC. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Wolf, Timothy)
September 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis County Circuit Court, case number 19SL-CC03865, with receipt number AMOEDC-7488250, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by PennyMac Loan Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form)(Wolf, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips et al v. PennyMac Loan Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lleona Phillips
Represented By: Angela M. Redden-Jansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calvin K Phillips
Represented By: Angela M. Redden-Jansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Tiffani L. Lightle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PennyMac Loan Services, LLC
Represented By: Timothy J. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?