Baker et al v. TitleMax of Missouri, Inc.
Plaintiff: Kennesha Beals, Gwendolyn Bates, Tracey Ballard, Latoyia Bates, Cara Banks, Laurie Ballew, Marketha L. Baker, David Bankster, Simone Baker and Antonio Banks
Defendant: TitleMax of Missouri, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv02677
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Henry Edward Autrey
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Docket Text ORDER OF DISMISSAL re: #12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs; SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 10/7/19. (KJS)
October 6, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Onder, James)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Docket Text ORDER: as to All Defendants Re: #8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant TitleMax of Missouri, Inc.. (Gilman, Stacey) filed by TitleMax of Missouri, Inc. ; GRANTED., All Defendants.. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 10/04/2019. (AAS)
October 3, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE Certificate of Filing of Notice of Removal in State Court and Proof of Service: by Defendant TitleMax of Missouri, Inc. (Durone, Anthony)
October 3, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant TitleMax of Missouri, Inc. Sent To: State Court - Executed (Durone, Anthony)
October 3, 2019 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant TitleMax of Missouri, Inc.. (Gilman, Stacey)
October 3, 2019 Filing 7 REASSIGNMENT ORDER (GJL). The above-styled and numbered case was removed from the City of St. Louis Circuit Court on September 30, 2019. A review of the case reflects that the Original Filing Form filed by counsel for defendant states: This Same Cause, Or A Substantially Equivalent Complaint, Was Previously Filed In This Court As Case Number 4:19-cv-02667 HEA And Assigned To The Honorable Henry E. Autrey. Due to clerical error, this case was randomly assigned to the Honorable Patricia L. Cohen, United States Magistrate Judge and must be reassigned. Accordingly, IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the above-styled cause is reassigned to the Honorable Henry E. Autrey, United States District Judge (BAK)
October 2, 2019 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENTAL re #1 Notice of Removal Petition, by Defendant TitleMax of Missouri, Inc.. (Durone, Anthony)
October 1, 2019 Filing 5 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
October 1, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen. (BAK)
October 1, 2019 Filing 4 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, Jefferson County, Missouri, filed by Antonio Banks, Tracey Ballard, David Bankster, Latoyia Bates, Simone Baker, Gwendolyn Bates, Marketha L. Baker, Laurie Ballew, Kennesha Beals, Cara Banks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(BAK)
September 30, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant TitleMax of Missouri, Inc.. Parent companies: TMX Finance LLC, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Durone, Anthony)
September 30, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant TitleMax of Missouri, Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Notice of Removal)(Durone, Anthony)
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Missouri, case number 19JE-CC00606, with receipt number AMOEDC-7491895, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by TitleMax of Missouri, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complete file from State Court, #2 Exhibit B - Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit C - Original Filing Form)(Durone, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker et al v. TitleMax of Missouri, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kennesha Beals
Represented By: Martin L. Daesch
Represented By: James G. Onder
Represented By: Jesse B. Rochman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gwendolyn Bates
Represented By: Martin L. Daesch
Represented By: James G. Onder
Represented By: Jesse B. Rochman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracey Ballard
Represented By: Martin L. Daesch
Represented By: James G. Onder
Represented By: Jesse B. Rochman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latoyia Bates
Represented By: Martin L. Daesch
Represented By: James G. Onder
Represented By: Jesse B. Rochman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cara Banks
Represented By: Martin L. Daesch
Represented By: James G. Onder
Represented By: Jesse B. Rochman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurie Ballew
Represented By: Martin L. Daesch
Represented By: James G. Onder
Represented By: Jesse B. Rochman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marketha L. Baker
Represented By: Martin L. Daesch
Represented By: James G. Onder
Represented By: Jesse B. Rochman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Bankster
Represented By: Martin L. Daesch
Represented By: James G. Onder
Represented By: Jesse B. Rochman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simone Baker
Represented By: Martin L. Daesch
Represented By: James G. Onder
Represented By: Jesse B. Rochman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Banks
Represented By: Martin L. Daesch
Represented By: James G. Onder
Represented By: Jesse B. Rochman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TitleMax of Missouri, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Durone
Represented By: Stacey R. Gilman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?