Schmidt v. SGBX Global, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Schmidt
Defendant: Brett Spencer, Spencergear, SGBX Global, Inc. and Blake Spencer
Case Number: 4:2019cv02699
Filed: October 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Audrey G Fleissig
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Christopher Schmidt Spencergear waiver signed on 10/4/2019, answer due 1/2/2020. (Bagsby, Larry)
November 4, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Christopher Schmidt Blake Spencer waiver signed on 10/4/2019, answer due 1/2/2020. (Bagsby, Larry)
November 4, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Christopher Schmidt Brett Spencer waiver signed on 10/4/2019, answer due 1/2/2020. (Bagsby, Larry)
November 4, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Christopher Schmidt SGBX Global, Inc. waiver signed on 10/4/2019, answer due 1/2/2020. (Bagsby, Larry)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Docket Text ORDER Re: #5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants SGBX Global, Inc., Blake Spencer, Brett Spencer, Spencergear; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 11/4/2019. (AFC)
November 1, 2019 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants SGBX Global, Inc., Blake Spencer, Brett Spencer, Spencergear. (Lewis, Jordan)
October 31, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by David P. Stoeberl for Defendants SGBX Global, Inc., Blake Spencer, Brett Spencer, Spencergear. (Stoeberl, David)
October 31, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Jordan Ross Lewis for Defendants SGBX Global, Inc., Blake Spencer, Brett Spencer, Spencergear. (Lewis, Jordan)
October 3, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Waivers issued 4. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig. (BAK)
October 3, 2019 Filing 2 REPORT to Commissioner of filing or determination of an action regarding patent. (BAK)
October 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number AMOEDC-7498774, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Christopher Schmidt.(Bagsby, Larry) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/3/2019: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Waiver of Service SGBX Global, #4 Waiver of Service Spencergear, #5 Waiver of Service Brett Spencer, #6 Waiver of Service Brett Spencer) (DJO). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/3/2019: #7 Exhibit 1, #8 Exhibit 2) (BAK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schmidt v. SGBX Global, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brett Spencer
Represented By: Jordan Ross Lewis
Represented By: David P. Stoeberl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spencergear
Represented By: Jordan Ross Lewis
Represented By: David P. Stoeberl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SGBX Global, Inc.
Represented By: Jordan Ross Lewis
Represented By: David P. Stoeberl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blake Spencer
Represented By: Jordan Ross Lewis
Represented By: David P. Stoeberl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Schmidt
Represented By: Larry A. Bagsby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?