Been v. Conopco, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Carla Been
Defendant: Does 1 through 10 and Conopco, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv02703
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Clark
Referring Judge: Patricia L Cohen
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Conopco, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Product Labels)(Muehlberger, James)
November 12, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant Conopco, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order per Chambers Requirements)(Muehlberger, James)
October 22, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Motion to Consolidate Case for Pre-Trial Proceedings: by Defendant Conopco, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Motion and Memorandum of Support)(Muehlberger, James)
October 18, 2019 Filing 9 CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Stephen R. Clark for all further proceedings. (AFC)
October 4, 2019 Filing 8 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Docket Text ORDER: Re #6 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Petition (Removal/Transfer) and Entry of Briefing Schedule by Defendant Conopco, Inc.; ORDERED GRANTED. (Response to Court due by 11/12/2019.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on 10/4/19. (EAB)
October 4, 2019 Filing 6 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Petition (Removal/Transfer) and Entry of Briefing Schedule by Defendant Conopco, Inc.. (Muehlberger, James)
October 4, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: Honorable Patricia L. Cohen. (MFG)
October 4, 2019 Filing 5 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis County, filed by Carla Been.(MFG)
October 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Conopco, Inc. Sent To: State Court - Executed (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Acknowlegment)(Muehlberger, James)
October 4, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Conopco, Inc.. Parent companies: Unilever United States, Inc., Subsidiaries: Trumbull Research Services, Inc., Sundial Brands, LLC, Publicly held company: Unilever PLC, Unilever NV,. (Muehlberger, James)
October 4, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Conopco, Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (Muehlberger, James)
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of St. Louis County State of Missouri, case number 19SL-CC2957, with receipt number AMOEDC-7500327, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Conopco, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Original Filing Form, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Muehlberger, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Been v. Conopco, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conopco, Inc.
Represented By: James Muehlberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carla Been
Represented By: Daniel F. Harvath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?