Francis Howell School District v. JUUL Labs, Inc.
Plaintiff: Francis Howell School District
Defendant: JUUL Labs, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv02713
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Henry Edward Autrey
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 ***REMARK: Case transferred from Missouri Eastern has been opened in California Northern District as case 3:19-cv-06909, filed 10/23/2019. (JWD)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF MDL TRANSFER to: Northern District of California. Case transferred via CM/ECF extraction. (DLB)
October 18, 2019 Filing 10 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO 2) regarding multidistrict litigation by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel. (DLB)
October 11, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Francis Howell School District. JUUL Labs, Inc. served on 10/11/2019, answer due 11/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service)(Margo, Mitchell)
October 10, 2019 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Mitchell A. Margo for Plaintiff Francis Howell School District. (Margo, Mitchell)
October 10, 2019 Summons Issued as to defendant JUUL Labs, Inc.. The summons was emailed to Cindy Reeds Ormsby. (KJS)
October 9, 2019 Filing 7 CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Henry Edward Autrey for all further proceedings. (TMT)
October 8, 2019 Filing 6 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
October 8, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM re #4 Memorandum Notice of Intent to Use Process Server by Plaintiff Francis Howell School District. (Ormsby, Cindy)
October 8, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Noelle C. Collins. (MFG)
October 7, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM Summons in a Civil Action by Plaintiff Francis Howell School District. (Ormsby, Cindy)
October 7, 2019 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiff Francis Howell School District. (Ormsby, Cindy)
October 7, 2019 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM Original Filing Form by Plaintiff Francis Howell School District. (Ormsby, Cindy)
October 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant JUUL Labs, Inc. Jury Demand,, filed by Francis Howell School District.(Ormsby, Cindy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Francis Howell School District v. JUUL Labs, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUUL Labs, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francis Howell School District
Represented By: Mitchell A. Margo
Represented By: Cindy Reeds Ormsby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?