Richards v. Conopco, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jamie Richards
Defendant: Does 1 through 10 and Conopco, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv02728
Filed: October 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Clark
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Docket Text ORDER: With the filing of the Amended Complaint #11 , Motion to Dismiss #9 is DENIED, as moot. So Ordered by Judge Stephen R. Clark on 12/05/19. (MCC)
December 4, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants JURY demand, , filed by Jamie Richards.(Harvath, Daniel)
November 14, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Conopco, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Labels)(Muehlberger, James)
November 14, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant Conopco, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Muehlberger, James)
October 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Motion to Consolidate Case for Pre-trial Proceedings: by Defendant Conopco, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Motion and Memorandum in Support)(Muehlberger, James)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Parties' Joint Motion for Extension of Time and Entry of Briefing Schedule #6 is GRANTED. Defendant shall file its responsive pleading or motion on or before November 14, 2019. If motion is filed, Plaintiff shall file her Response to Defendant's motion on or before December 16, 2019. Defendant shall file any Reply to Plaintiff's Response on or before January 6, 2020.. Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 10/11/19. (KKS)
October 8, 2019 Filing 6 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Petition (Removal/Transfer) and Entry of Briefing Schedule by Defendant Conopco, Inc.. (Muehlberger, James)
October 8, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Stephen R. Clark. (BAK)
October 8, 2019 Filing 5 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, City of St. Louis, filed by Jamie Richards.(BAK)
October 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Conopco, Inc. Sent To: State Court - Executed (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Acknowledgment)(Muehlberger, James)
October 8, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Conopco, Inc.. Parent companies: Unilever United States, Inc., Subsidiaries: Trumbull Research Services, Inc., Sundial Brands, LLC, Publicly held company: Unilever PLC, Unilever NV,. (Muehlberger, James)
October 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Conopco, Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (Muehlberger, James)
October 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of St. Louis City, case number 1922-CC10821, with receipt number AMOEDC-7507526, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Conopco, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court File, #3 Original Filing Form, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Muehlberger, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richards v. Conopco, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conopco, Inc.
Represented By: James Muehlberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Richards
Represented By: Daniel F. Harvath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?