Wilmes v. Packsize, LLC
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Wilmes
Defendant: Packsize, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv02749
Filed: October 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Clark
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 Filing 15 FIRST AMENDED PETITION against defendant Packsize, LLC Amendment to #4 Petition (Removal/Transfer), filed by Elizabeth Wilmes. Related document: #4 Petition (Removal/Transfer) filed by Elizabeth Wilmes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(KKS)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Docket Text ORDER: Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint #13 is GRANTED. So Ordered by Judge Stephen R. Clark on 12/05/19. (MCC)
November 12, 2019 Filing 13 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend PETITION by Plaintiff Elizabeth Wilmes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit First Amended Petition, #2 Exhibit Comparison Exhibit, #3 Exhibit Original Petition)(Stuffle, Christopher)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that #10 and #11 Plaintiff's Motions for Leave to File Amended Complaint are DENIED without prejudice for failure to comply with the undersigned's Judge's Requirements. Plaintiff must refile her Motion for Leave by no later than Wednesday, November 13, 2019. Plaintiff must include, as an exhibit, the amended complaint with all changes to the original complaint tracked using the Word Compare feature. See the following link for instructions: https://support.office.com/en-us/article/compare-and-merge-two- versions-of-a-document-f5059749-a797-4db7-a8fb-b3b27eb8b87e Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 11/12/2019. (CLO)
November 12, 2019 Filing 11 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend PETITION by Plaintiff Elizabeth Wilmes. (Attachments: #1 Original Filing Form First Amended Petition, #2 Exhibit First Amended Petition with Tracking, #3 Exhibit Original Petition)(Stuffle, Christopher)
November 8, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend PETITION by Plaintiff Elizabeth Wilmes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit First Amended Petition, #2 Exhibit Original Petition, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Stuffle, Christopher)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that #8 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint is DENIED, without prejudice, for failure to comply with the undersigned's Judge's Requirements. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff must refile her motion in compliance with the undersigned's Judge's Requirements by no later than Friday, November 8, 2019. ( Response to Court due by 11/8/2019.). Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 11/5/19. (KKS)
November 5, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend by Plaintiff Elizabeth Wilmes. (Stuffle, Christopher)
October 16, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Packsize, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Devine, Julie)
October 16, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim by Defendant Packsize, LLC. (Devine, Julie)
October 11, 2019 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Packsize, LLC.. (Devine, Julie)
October 10, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Stephen R. Clark. (BAK)
October 10, 2019 Filing 4 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, St. Charles County, Missouri, filed by Elizabeth Wilmes. (Attachments: #1 EEOC Right to Sue Charging Letter, #2 MCHR Right to Sue Charging Letter)(BAK)
October 10, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Stephen L. Beimdiek for Defendant Packsize, LLC. (Beimdiek, Stephen)
October 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Packsize, LLC Sent To: Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Attachment Notice of Removal)(Devine, Julie)
October 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of St. Charles County, Missouri, case number 1911-CC00823, with receipt number AMOEDC-7513365, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Packsize, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment State Court File, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form)(Devine, Julie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilmes v. Packsize, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Wilmes
Represented By: Christopher Michael Stuffle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Packsize, LLC
Represented By: Julie Z. Devine
Represented By: Stephen L. Beimdiek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?