Pendleton v. Professional Recovery Consultants, Inc.
Plaintiff: Hope Pendleton
Defendant: Professional Recovery Consultants, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv02762
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Audrey G Fleissig
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case is STAYED pending the conclusion of Plaintiff's bankruptcy case or the abandonment of her claim by the bankruptcy trustee, whichever occurs first. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, within 10 days following any event in the bankruptcy case affecting the present case, the parties shall advise the Court of such event and request further relief from this Court as appropriate. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, in the interim, this case shall be deemed closed for statistical purposes. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 11/26/2019. (AFC)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 2: Standard. [SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS.] (Motion to Join Parties due by 1/13/2020. Discovery Completion due by 5/25/2020. Non-Dispositive Motions due by 6/5/2020. ADR Future Reference 4/20/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 6/26/2020. Jury Trial set for 11/9/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 12S - St. Louis before District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig. Pretrial Compliance due by 10/20/2020. Motion in Limine due by 10/26/2020.) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 11/26/2019. (AFC)
November 25, 2019 Filing 13 SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Strike Defendant's Affirmative Defenses (Supplemental Response) filed by Defendant Professional Recovery Consultants, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Ammon, Daniel) Modified on 11/26/2019 (MCB).
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Docket Text ORDER Re: #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Daniel J Ammon by Defendant Professional Recovery Consultants, Inc.; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 11/20/2019. (AFC)
November 19, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Strike Defendant's Affirmative Defenses filed by Defendant Professional Recovery Consultants, Inc.. (Ammon, Daniel)
November 19, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Daniel J Ammon. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-7591127) by Defendant Professional Recovery Consultants, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Ammon, Daniel)
November 14, 2019 Filing 9 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiff Hope Pendleton. . (Voytas, Richard)
November 6, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Strike Defendant's Affirmative Defenses by Plaintiff Hope Pendleton. (Voytas, Richard)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RULE 16 ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 2. Joint Scheduling Plan due by 11/18/2019. Rule 16 Conference set for 11/25/2019 03:00 PM in Chambers before District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on October 21, 2019. (MCB)
October 16, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Professional Recovery Consultants, Inc..(Neidle, Gregory)
October 11, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Audrey G. Fleissig. (MFG)
October 11, 2019 Filing 5 Letter to attorney Gregory R. Neidle from Clerk re: Admission To Practice Law (MFG)
October 11, 2019 Filing 4 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis City, filed by Hope Pendleton.(MFG)
October 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Professional Recovery Consultants, Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (Neidle, Gregory)
October 11, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Professional Recovery Consultants, Inc... (Neidle, Gregory)
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 22nd Judicial Circuit Court of the City of St. Louis, Missouri, case number 1922-AC11885, with receipt number AMOEDC-7516296, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Professional Recovery Consultants, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Complete State Court File and Docket, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form)(Neidle, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pendleton v. Professional Recovery Consultants, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Professional Recovery Consultants, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory R. Neidle
Represented By: Daniel J Ammon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hope Pendleton
Represented By: Richard A. Voytas, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?