Knipschield v. CIOX Health, LLC
Plaintiff: Diana Knipschield
Defendant: CIOX Health, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv02908
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: John A Ross
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Diana Knipschield. (Cornfeld, Richard)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #9 Consent MOTION for Extension of: Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Diana Knipschield. (Cornfeld, Richard) ; ORDERED GRANTED ( Response to Court due by 12/24/2019.). Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 11/27/2019. (CLO)
November 27, 2019 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of: Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Diana Knipschield. (Cornfeld, Richard)
November 22, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Memorandum in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant CIOX Health, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Potts, Jonathan)
November 22, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Defendant CIOX Health, LLC. (Potts, Jonathan)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Docket Text ORDER: as to CIOX Health, LLC Re: #5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal Petition (Potts, Jonathan) filed by CIOX Health, LLC ; ORDERED GRANTED, CIOX Health, LLC answer due 11/22/2019. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 11/4/19. (JAB)
November 1, 2019 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal Petition, Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Class Action Petition by Defendant CIOX Health, LLC. (Potts, Jonathan)
October 25, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge John A. Ross. (BAK)
October 25, 2019 Filing 4 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, St. Charles County, Missouri, filed by Diana Knipschield. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(BAK) Modified on 10/28/2019- Exhibits A and B SEALED- contain personal identifiers.(CLO).
October 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant CIOX Health, LLC Notice to Plaintiff of Filing of Notice of Removal Sent To: Plaintiff (Potts, Jonathan)
October 25, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant CIOX Health, LLC.. (Potts, Jonathan)
October 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Charles County, case number 1911-CC00911, with receipt number AMOEDC-7543746, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by CIOX Health, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court File, #2 Exhibit 2 - Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit 3 - Original Filing Form)(Potts, Jonathan) Modified on 10/28/2019- Exhibit 1 SEALED contains personal identifiers. (CLO).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knipschield v. CIOX Health, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIOX Health, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan B. Potts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Knipschield
Represented By: Richard S. Cornfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?