Been v. Greentree Cleaners, Inc.
Plaintiff: Carla Been
Defendant: GREENTREE CLEANERS and Greentree Cleaners, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv02915
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: John A Ross
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to File a Sur-Reply Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Remand by Defendant Greentree Cleaners, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Sur-Reply Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Remand)(Kaemmerer, Bryan)
December 2, 2019 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Greentree Cleaners, Inc.. (Kaemmerer, Bryan) Modified text on 12/3/2019 (JAB).
November 27, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim filed by Plaintiff Carla Been. (Harvath, Daniel)
November 22, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court AND REQUEST FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES to MISSOURI STATE COURT filed by Plaintiff Carla Been. (Harvath, Daniel)
November 20, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court AND REQUEST FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES to MISSOURI STATE COURT filed by Defendant Greentree Cleaners, Inc.. (Kaemmerer, Bryan)
November 18, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Greentree Cleaners, Inc.. (Kaemmerer, Bryan)
November 18, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant Greentree Cleaners, Inc.. (Kaemmerer, Bryan)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following schedule will apply: Defendant shall file its Memorandum in Opposition no later than November 20, 2019; and Plaintiff shall file her Reply in Support no later than December 13, 2019. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 11/7/19. (JAB)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 Petition (Removal/Transfer) by Defendant Greentree Cleaners, Inc. (Kaemmerer, Bryan) ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 11/7/19. (JAB)
November 6, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION Regarding the Parties' Briefing Schedule in Connection with Plaintiff's Motion for Remand by Defendant Greentree Cleaners, Inc.. (Kaemmerer, Bryan)
November 6, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Amend/Correct its Notice of Removal by Defendant Greentree Cleaners, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Amended Notice of Removal)(Kaemmerer, Bryan)
October 30, 2019 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael E. Kaemmerer for Defendant Greentree Cleaners, Inc.. (Kaemmerer, Michael)
October 29, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court AND REQUEST FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES to MISSOURI STATE COURT by Plaintiff Carla Been. (Harvath, Daniel)
October 29, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Greentree Cleaners, Inc. Sent To: State Court - Executed (Kaemmerer, Bryan)
October 29, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 Petition (Removal/Transfer) by Defendant Greentree Cleaners, Inc.. (Kaemmerer, Bryan)
October 28, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge John A. Ross. (BAK)
October 28, 2019 Filing 4 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, St. Louis County, Missouri, filed by Carla Been.(BAK)
October 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Greentree Cleaners, Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Kaemmerer, Bryan)
October 28, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Greentree Cleaners, Inc.. Parent companies: none, Subsidiaries: none, Publicly held company: none,. (Kaemmerer, Bryan)
October 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis County Circuit Court, case number 19SL-CC03931, with receipt number AMOEDC-7545573, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Greentree Cleaners, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Exhibit 2, #3 Original Filing Form Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Declaration)(Kaemmerer, Bryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Been v. Greentree Cleaners, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREENTREE CLEANERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greentree Cleaners, Inc.
Represented By: Bryan M. Kaemmerer
Represented By: Michael E. Kaemmerer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carla Been
Represented By: Daniel F. Harvath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?