Wahlers v. Hendren et al
Plaintiff: Aimee Wahlers and Aimee L. Wahlers
Defendant: City of St. Louis, Gary Foster, Patrick Riordan and Nathaniel Hendren
Case Number: 4:2019cv03064
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Clark
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that #20 Plaintiff's Consent Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED.. Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 12/30/19. (KKS)
December 28, 2019 Filing 20 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #19 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Aimee L. Wahlers. (Simon, John)
December 19, 2019 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #15 MOTION to Dismiss Party filed by Defendants City of St. Louis, Gary Foster. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Ordinance 57821), #2 Exhibit B (State Court Order))(Wheaton, Andrew)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that #16 Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Memorandum in Excess of Page Limitations is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants City of St. Louis and Gary Foster shall re-file their brief with a table of contents and table of authorities, pursuant to the undersigned's Judge's Requirements. Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 12/19/2019. (CLO)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that #14 Plaintiff's Consent Motion for Extension to Respond to Defendant Hendren's Motion to Stay the Proceedings is GRANTED. ( Response to Court due by 1/9/2020.). Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 12/19/2019. (CLO)
December 18, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation by Defendants City of St. Louis, Gary Foster. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A (Certified Copy of Ordinance 57821), #3 Exhibit B (State Court Order))(Wheaton, Andrew)
December 18, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss Party by Defendants City of St. Louis, Gary Foster. (Wheaton, Andrew)
December 18, 2019 Filing 14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 MOTION to Stay proceedings pending termination of state court criminal case, at least as it pertains to Defendant Hendren, by Plaintiff Aimee L. Wahlers. (Simon, John)
December 12, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #12 MOTION to Stay proceedings pending termination of state court criminal case, at least as it pertains to Defendant Hendren, filed by Defendant Nathaniel Hendren. (Newton, Talmage)
December 12, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Stay proceedings pending termination of state court criminal case, at least as it pertains to Defendant Hendren, by Defendant Nathaniel Hendren. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - State Court Indictment, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - State Court Scheduling Order)(Newton, Talmage) Modified on 12/13/2019- Exhibit 1 SEALED due to it containing personal identifiers. (CLO).
December 12, 2019 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Talmage E. Newton, IV for Defendant Nathaniel Hendren. (Newton, Talmage)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that #9 Consent Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED. No further extensions of this deadline are anticipated. Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 12/12/2019. (CLO)
December 11, 2019 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Petition (Removal/Transfer), by Defendants City of St. Louis, Gary Foster. (Wheaton, Andrew)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that #7 Defendants' Consent Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 11/14/19. (JAB)
November 14, 2019 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Petition (Removal/Transfer), by Defendants City of St. Louis, Gary Foster. (Wheaton, Andrew)
November 12, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Andrew David Wheaton for Defendants City of St. Louis, Gary Foster. (Wheaton, Andrew)
November 8, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Abby J. Duncan for Defendants City of St. Louis, Gary Foster. (Duncan, Abby)
November 8, 2019 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENTAL State Court Docket Sheet. (MFG)
November 8, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Stephen R. Clark. (MFG)
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants City of St. Louis, Gary Foster Sent To: Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Notice to State Court of Removal)(Duncan, Abby)
November 7, 2019 Filing 3 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis City, filed by Aimee L. Wahlers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit 6, #6 Exhibit 7)(MFG) (Main Document 3 replaced on 11/8/2019) (MFG).
November 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 22nd Judicial Circuit Court, case number 1922-CC11675, with receipt number AMOEDC-7570267, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Gary Foster, City of St. Louis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #12 Attachment Original Filing Form)(Duncan, Abby)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wahlers v. Hendren et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of St. Louis
Represented By: Abby J. Duncan
Represented By: Andrew David Wheaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Foster
Represented By: Abby J. Duncan
Represented By: Andrew David Wheaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Riordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathaniel Hendren
Represented By: Talmage E. Newton, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aimee Wahlers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aimee L. Wahlers
Represented By: John M. Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?