Cox v. Brentwood, Missouri, City of
Plaintiff: Willie Cox, Jr.
Defendant: Brentwood, Missouri, City of
Case Number: 4:2019cv03067
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Patricia L Cohen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER of USCA as to #6 Notice of Appeal filed by Willie Cox, Jr. - USCA Appeal #: 19-3571: If the original file of the United States District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by Eighth Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with Eighth Circuit Local Rule 30A(a)(2), the Clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER, including any documents maintained in paper format or filed under seal, exhibits, CDs, videos, administrative records and state court files. These documents should be submitted within 10 days. (AFC)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER of USCA as to #6 Notice of Appeal filed by Willie Cox, Jr.: USCA Appeal #: 19-3571: The $505 appellate filing and docketing fee has not been paid and is due. Appellant is directed to either pay the fee in the district court or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in this court within 28 days of the date of this order. If appellant does not pay the fee or move for IFP status by 01/02/2020, this appeal may be dismissed for failure to prosecute without further notice. (AFC)
December 4, 2019 Filing 8 Initial Notification from USCA for #6 Notice of Appeal filed by Willie Cox, Jr.: USCA Appeal Number: 19-3571.(AFC)
December 2, 2019 Filing 7 NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL AND NOA SUPPLEMENT by clerk to USCA regarding #4 Opinion Memorandum, #5 Order of Dismissal (case - Stipulation of Dismissal). Notice of Appeal filed on 11/15/19 by Plaintiff Willie Cox, Jr. NOTIFICATION TO COUNSEL AND PRO SE PARTY: FILE REQUEST FOR TRANSCRIPT WITH DISTRICT COURT CLERKS OFFICE.(JWD)
November 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #4 Opinion Memorandum, #5 Order of Dismissal (case - Stipulation of Dismissal) by Plaintiff Willie Cox, Jr. (JMP)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 4,5. Fri Nov 15 16:18:10 CST 2019 (Shirley, Kelley)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF DISMISSAL - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED without prejudice. IT IS HEREBY CERTIFIED that an appeal from this action would not be taken in good faith. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 11/15/19. (KJS)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. #2 ) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED without prejudice. A separate order of dismissal will be entered herewith. IT IS HEREBY CERTIFIED that an appeal from this dismissal would not be taken in good faith. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 11/15/19. (KJS)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
November 8, 2019 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Fri Nov 8 13:01:14 CST 2019 (admin,)
November 8, 2019 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (BAK)
November 8, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen. (BAK)
November 7, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Willie Cox, Jr. (BAK)
November 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Brentwood, Missouri, City of Jury Demand,, filed by Willie Cox, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form, #4 List of previous cases filed part 1, #5 List of previous cases filed part 2)(BAK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cox v. Brentwood, Missouri, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brentwood, Missouri, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Cox, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?