Manalansan-Lord v. U.S. Department of Education et al
Plaintiff: Udis Sanchez Manalansan-Lord
Defendant: Coast Professional, Inc. Headquater and U.S. Department of Education
Case Number: 4:2019cv03086
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Noelle C Collins
Referring Judge: Audrey G Fleissig
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendant U.S. Department of Education. (Jones, Joshua)
January 2, 2020 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Paul M. Croker for Defendant Coast Professional, Inc. Headquater. (Croker, Paul)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 10. Thu Jan 2 13:36:17 CST 2020 (Shirley, Kelley)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Coast Professional, Inc. is granted leave to file its answer out of time. ECF No. #9 . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs motion for clerks entry of default is DENIED. ECF No. #7 . Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 1/2/20. (KJS)
December 31, 2019 Filing 9 Coast Professional Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Answer and Affirmative Defenses by Coast Professional, Inc. Headquater.(Croker, Paul)
December 31, 2019 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Coast Professional, Inc. Headquater.. (Croker, Paul)
December 30, 2019 Filing 13 SUPPLEMENTAL by Plaintiff Udis Sanchez Manalansan-Lord. (AFC)
December 30, 2019 Filing 12 SUPPLEMENTAL by Plaintiff Udis Sanchez Manalansan-Lord. (AFC)
December 27, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Entry of Clerk's Default against Defendant Coast Professional, Inc by Plaintiff Udis Sanchez Manalansan-Lord. (KJS)
December 18, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Udis Sanchez Manalansan-Lord. Coast Professional, Inc. Headquarter served on 12/4/2019, answer due 12/26/2019. (TMT)
November 25, 2019 Filing 5 CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig for all further proceedings. (TMT)
November 21, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Udis Sanchez Manalansan-Lord. U.S. Department of Education served on 11/14/2019, answer due 12/5/2019. (KCB)
November 14, 2019 Filing 3 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
November 13, 2019 Receipt 4644083814 in the amount of $400.00 for CIVIL FILING FEE on behalf of Udis S Manalansan Lord (CCAM)
November 13, 2019 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Wed Nov 13 13:01:46 CST 2019 (admin,)
November 13, 2019 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (JWD)
November 13, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 4 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to plaintiff Udis Sanchez Manalansan-Lord. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Noelle C. Collins. (JWD)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Udis Sanchez Manalansan-Lord Process Server: U.S. Marshal's Service (Attachments: #1 Summons Department of Education, #2 Summons US Attorney, #3 Summons US Attorney General, #4 Summons Coast Professional, Inc. Headquarters)(JWD)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Coast Professional, Inc. Headquater, U.S. Department of Education, Non-Jury Demand, filed by Udis Sanchez Manalansan-Lord. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Final Decree, #2 Exhibit 2 - Discharge of Debtor, #3 Exhibit 3 - Schedule E, #4 Exhibit 4 - Wage Garnishment Order, #5 Exhibit 5 - Work Garnishment Worksheet, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Original Filing Form)(JWD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Manalansan-Lord v. U.S. Department of Education et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coast Professional, Inc. Headquater
Represented By: Paul M. Croker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Education
Represented By: Joshua Michael Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Udis Sanchez Manalansan-Lord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?