Reed v. Monsanto Company et al
Plaintiff: Martin Denny Reed
Defendant: John Does 1 through 100 inclusive and Monsanto Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv03090
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: John A Ross
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2019 ***REMARK; Case transferred from Missouri Eastern has been opened in California Northern District as case 3:19-cv-08088, filed 12/12/2019. (DJO)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF MDL TRANSFER to: Northern District of California. Case transferred via CM/ECF extraction. (DLB)
December 10, 2019 Filing 4 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO 171) regarding multidistrict litigation by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel (DLB)
December 9, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Martin Denny Reed. Monsanto Company served on 11/19/2019, answer due 12/10/2019. (Kirk, Emily)
November 14, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to Emily J. Kirk. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable John A. Ross. (MFG)
November 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Martin Denny Reed Process Server: Civil Action Group dba APS International (MFG)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number AMOEDC-7578549, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Martin Denny Reed. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Form Notice of Intent to Use Process Server, #3 Original Filing Form, #4 Summons)(Kirk, Emily)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reed v. Monsanto Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1 through 100 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Denny Reed
Represented By: Emily Jo Kirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?