Gillick et al v. Elliott et al
Plaintiff: David Gillick, Terry Briggs, Robert Bieg, Jr., Michael Lutz, Bradley Grant and Corey Black
Defendant: Steve MacDonald, Matthew Andrews, Gary Elliott, Richard McLaughlin, Brandon Flinn and Don Willey
Case Number: 4:2019cv03094
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Jean C Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2019 Filing 28 ENTRY of Appearance by Matthew B. Leppert for Defendants Matthew Andrews, Gary Elliott, Brandon Flinn, Steve MacDonald, Richard McLaughlin, Don Willey. (Leppert, Matthew)
December 30, 2019 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #26 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Matthew Andrews, Gary Elliott, Brandon Flinn, Steve MacDonald, Richard McLaughlin, Don Willey. (Singer, James)
December 30, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendants Matthew Andrews, Gary Elliott, Brandon Flinn, Steve MacDonald, Richard McLaughlin, Don Willey. (Singer, James)
December 11, 2019 Filing 25 CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Jean C. Hamilton for all further proceedings. (EAB)
December 2, 2019 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Don Willey Don Willey waiver signed on 11/26/2019, answer due 1/27/2020. (Singer, James)
December 2, 2019 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Steve MacDonald Steve MacDonald waiver signed on 11/26/2019, answer due 1/27/2020. (Singer, James)
December 2, 2019 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Richard McLaughlin Richard McLaughlin waiver signed on 11/26/2019, answer due 1/27/2020. (Singer, James)
December 2, 2019 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Brandon Flinn Brandon Flinn waiver signed on 11/26/2019, answer due 1/27/2020. (Singer, James)
December 2, 2019 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Gary Elliott Gary Elliott waiver signed on 11/26/2019, answer due 1/27/2020. (Singer, James)
December 2, 2019 Filing 19 ENTRY of Appearance by James I. Singer for Defendants Matthew Andrews, Gary Elliott, Brandon Flinn, Steve MacDonald, Richard McLaughlin, Don Willey. (Singer, James)
December 2, 2019 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Matthew Andrews, Matthew Andrews waiver signed on 11/26/2019. (Singer, James)
December 2, 2019 ***REMARK: After speaking with attorney Rex Fennessey's office, summonses previously issued were returned unexecuted (docs. 11 - 17) as they have opted to issue Waivers of Service for all defendants. (AFC)
November 25, 2019 Filing 17 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Michael Lutz, Robert Bieg, Jr., Bradley Grant, Terry Briggs, David Gillick, Corey Black as to Steve MacDonald. (Fennessey, Rex)
November 25, 2019 Filing 16 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Michael Lutz, Robert Bieg, Jr., Bradley Grant, Terry Briggs, David Gillick, Corey Black as to Richard McLaughlin. (Fennessey, Rex)
November 25, 2019 Filing 15 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Michael Lutz, Robert Bieg, Jr., Bradley Grant, Terry Briggs, David Gillick, Corey Black as to Matthew Andrews. (Fennessey, Rex)
November 25, 2019 Filing 14 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Michael Lutz, Robert Bieg, Jr., Bradley Grant, Terry Briggs, David Gillick, Corey Black as to Gary Elliott. (Fennessey, Rex)
November 25, 2019 Filing 13 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Robert Bieg, Jr., Corey Black as to Brandon Flinn. (Fennessey, Rex)
November 25, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Michael Lutz, Robert Bieg, Jr., Bradley Grant, Terry Briggs, David Gillick, Corey Black as to Don Willey. (Fennessey, Rex)
November 25, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Michael Lutz, Bradley Grant, Terry Briggs, David Gillick as to Brandon Flinn. (Fennessey, Rex)
November 15, 2019 Filing 10 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
November 15, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 6 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to Rex P. Fennessey. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: Honorable Patricia L. Cohen. (MFG)
November 14, 2019 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENTAL re #2 Notice of Process Server, #1 Complaint, Summons of Steve MacDonald by Plaintiffs Robert Bieg, Jr., Corey Black, Terry Briggs, David Gillick, Bradley Grant, Michael Lutz. (Fennessey, Rex)
November 14, 2019 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENTAL re #2 Notice of Process Server, #1 Complaint, Summons of Richard McLaughlin by Plaintiffs Robert Bieg, Jr., Corey Black, Terry Briggs, David Gillick, Bradley Grant, Michael Lutz. (Fennessey, Rex)
November 14, 2019 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENTAL re #2 Notice of Process Server, #1 Complaint, Summons of Matthew Andrews by Plaintiffs Robert Bieg, Jr., Corey Black, Terry Briggs, David Gillick, Bradley Grant, Michael Lutz. (Fennessey, Rex)
November 14, 2019 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENTAL re #2 Notice of Process Server, #1 Complaint, Summons of Gary Elliott by Plaintiffs Robert Bieg, Jr., Corey Black, Terry Briggs, David Gillick, Bradley Grant, Michael Lutz. (Fennessey, Rex)
November 14, 2019 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENTAL re #2 Notice of Process Server, #1 Complaint, Summons of Don Willey by Plaintiffs Robert Bieg, Jr., Corey Black, Terry Briggs, David Gillick, Bradley Grant, Michael Lutz. (Fennessey, Rex)
November 14, 2019 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENTAL re #2 Notice of Process Server, #1 Complaint, Summons for Brandon Flinn by Plaintiffs Robert Bieg, Jr., Corey Black, Terry Briggs, David Gillick, Bradley Grant, Michael Lutz. (Fennessey, Rex)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiffs Robert Bieg, Jr., Corey Black, Terry Briggs, David Gillick, Bradley Grant, Michael Lutz. Parent companies: N/A, Subsidiaries: N/A, Publicly held company: N/A,. (Fennessey, Rex)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs Robert Bieg, Jr., Corey Black, Terry Briggs, David Gillick, Bradley Grant, Michael Lutz Process Server: Jack Eisen/Eisen Enterprises (Fennessey, Rex)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number AMOEDC-7580134, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Michael Lutz, Robert Bieg, Jr., Bradley Grant, Terry Briggs, David Gillick, Corey Black. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form)(Fennessey, Rex)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gillick et al v. Elliott et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Gillick
Represented By: Rex P. Fennessey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Briggs
Represented By: Rex P. Fennessey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Bieg, Jr.
Represented By: Rex P. Fennessey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Lutz
Represented By: Rex P. Fennessey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley Grant
Represented By: Rex P. Fennessey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey Black
Represented By: Rex P. Fennessey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve MacDonald
Represented By: James I. Singer
Represented By: Matthew B. Leppert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Andrews
Represented By: James I. Singer
Represented By: Matthew B. Leppert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Elliott
Represented By: James I. Singer
Represented By: Matthew B. Leppert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard McLaughlin
Represented By: James I. Singer
Represented By: Matthew B. Leppert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Flinn
Represented By: James I. Singer
Represented By: Matthew B. Leppert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Willey
Represented By: James I. Singer
Represented By: Matthew B. Leppert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?