Gillick et al v. Willey et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Leritz, Lou Grasse, David Gillick, William Luth, Joseph Hoette and Doug Wachsnicht
Defendant: Gary Elliot, Don Willey, Ronny Griffin, Richard McLaughlin, Jeff O'Connell and Brandon Flinn
Case Number: 4:2019cv03095
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Sarah E Pitlyk
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following cases shall be transferred to District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk. All deadlines previously set remain in effect unless otherwise ordered by the Court. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 1/9/2020. (KXS)
December 30, 2019 Filing 19 ENTRY of Appearance by Matthew B. Leppert for Defendants Gary Elliot, Brandon Flinn, Ronny Griffin, Richard McLaughlin, Jeff O'Connell, Don Willey. (Leppert, Matthew)
December 30, 2019 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #17 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Gary Elliot, Brandon Flinn, Ronny Griffin, Richard McLaughlin, Jeff O'Connell, Don Willey. (Singer, James) (Main Document 18 replaced on 12/30/2019) (KXS).
December 30, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendants Gary Elliot, Brandon Flinn, Ronny Griffin, Richard McLaughlin, Jeff O'Connell, Don Willey. (Singer, James) (Main Document 17 replaced on 12/30/2019) (KXS).
December 2, 2019 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Don Willey Don Willey waiver signed on 11/26/2019, answer due 1/27/2020. (Singer, James)
December 2, 2019 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Jeff O'Connell Jeff O'Connell waiver signed on 11/26/2019, answer due 1/27/2020. (Singer, James)
December 2, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Richard McLaughlin Richard McLaughlin waiver signed on 11/26/2019, answer due 1/27/2020. (Singer, James)
December 2, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Ronny Griffin Ronny Griffin waiver signed on 11/26/2019, answer due 1/27/2020. (Singer, James)
December 2, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Brandon Flinn Brandon Flinn waiver signed on 11/26/2019, answer due 1/27/2020. (Singer, James)
December 2, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Gary Elliot Gary Elliot waiver signed on 11/26/2019, answer due 1/27/2020. (Singer, James)
December 2, 2019 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by James I. Singer for Defendants Gary Elliot, Brandon Flinn, Ronny Griffin, Richard McLaughlin, Jeff O'Connell, Don Willey. (Singer, James)
November 26, 2019 ***REMARK - After consultation with attorney Rex Fennessey's office, summonses previously issues were returned unexecuted (docs. 4 - 9) as they have opted to issue Waivers of Service for all defendants. (CSG)
November 25, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Doug Wachsnicht, Lou Grasse, Joseph Leritz, David Gillick, William Luth, Joseph Hoette as to Ronny Griffin. (Fennessey, Rex)
November 25, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Doug Wachsnicht, Lou Grasse, Joseph Leritz, David Gillick, William Luth, Joseph Hoette as to Richard McLaughlin. (Fennessey, Rex)
November 25, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Doug Wachsnicht, Lou Grasse, Joseph Leritz, David Gillick, William Luth, Joseph Hoette as to Jeff O'Connell. (Fennessey, Rex)
November 25, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Doug Wachsnicht, Lou Grasse, Joseph Leritz, David Gillick, William Luth, Joseph Hoette as to Gary Elliot. (Fennessey, Rex)
November 25, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Doug Wachsnicht, Lou Grasse, Joseph Leritz, David Gillick, William Luth, Joseph Hoette as to Don Willey. (Fennessey, Rex)
November 25, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Doug Wachsnicht, Lou Grasse, Joseph Leritz, David Gillick, William Luth, Joseph Hoette as to Brandon Flinn. (Fennessey, Rex)
November 14, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 6 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to attorney Rex Fennessey. Judge Assigned: Honorable Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr.. (JWD)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiffs David Gillick, Lou Grasse, Joseph Hoette, Joseph Leritz, William Luth, Doug Wachsnicht. Parent companies: N/A, Subsidiaries: N/A, Publicly held company: N/A,. (Fennessey, Rex)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs David Gillick, Lou Grasse, Joseph Hoette, Joseph Leritz, William Luth, Doug Wachsnicht Process Server: Jack Eisen/Eisen Enterprises (Fennessey, Rex)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number AMOEDC-7580146, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Doug Wachsnicht, Lou Grasse, Joseph Leritz, David Gillick, William Luth, Joseph Hoette. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form)(Fennessey, Rex) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/14/2019: #3 Brandon Flinn Summons, #4 Don Willey Summons, #5 Gary Elliot Summons, #6 Jeff O'Connell Summons, #7 Richard McLaughlin Summons, #8 Ronny Griffin Summons) (JWD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gillick et al v. Willey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Leritz
Represented By: Rex P. Fennessey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lou Grasse
Represented By: Rex P. Fennessey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Gillick
Represented By: Rex P. Fennessey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Luth
Represented By: Rex P. Fennessey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Hoette
Represented By: Rex P. Fennessey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doug Wachsnicht
Represented By: Rex P. Fennessey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Elliot
Represented By: James I. Singer
Represented By: Matthew B. Leppert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Willey
Represented By: James I. Singer
Represented By: Matthew B. Leppert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronny Griffin
Represented By: James I. Singer
Represented By: Matthew B. Leppert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard McLaughlin
Represented By: James I. Singer
Represented By: Matthew B. Leppert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff O'Connell
Represented By: James I. Singer
Represented By: Matthew B. Leppert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Flinn
Represented By: James I. Singer
Represented By: Matthew B. Leppert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?