Hembrador v. PruGen, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ivy Hembrador
Defendant: PruGen, LLC and Mike Pinto
Case Number: 4:2019cv03203
Filed: December 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Clark
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2020 Filing 16 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiff Ivy Hembrador. . (Ghio, Matthew)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Rule 16 Conference is reset for February 11, 2020 at 1:30 p.m. in Chambers before District Judge Stephen R. Clark. Lead trial counsel must appear for the conference in person. The shall file a joint proposed scheduling plan by no later than January 27, 2020.. Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 1/22/20. (KKS)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that #13 Defendant's Motion to Continue Scheduling Conference is GRANTED. The Rule 16 Conference is reset for February 14, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. in Chambers before District Judge Stephen R. Clark. Lead trial counsel must appear for the conference in person. ( Rule 16 Conference set for 2/14/2020 11:00 AM in Chambers before District Judge Stephen R. Clark.) Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 1/15/20. (JAB)
January 13, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Continue Defendants' Motion to Continue Scheduling Conference Rule 16 Conference by Defendants Mike Pinto, PruGen, LLC. (Hirtz, Adam)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RULE 16 ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 2 ; Joint Scheduling Plan due by 1/27/2020. Rule 16 Conference set for 2/6/2020 11:00 AM in Chambers before District Judge Stephen R. Clark. Lead trial counsel must appear for the conference in-person.. Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 1/10/20. (KKS)
December 10, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED ANSWER to #5 Amended Petition (Removal/Transfer) amended form filer filed by Mike Pinto filed by Defendant Mike Pinto. (Hirtz, Adam)
December 10, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED ANSWER to #5 Amended Petition (Removal/Transfer) amended form filer filed by PruGen, LLC filed by Defendant PruGen, LLC. (Hirtz, Adam)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants PruGen, LLC and Mike Pinto must file an amended answer that complies with the undersigned's Judge's Requirements by no later than Wednesday, December 11, 2019. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that #7 Defendant PruGen, LLC's Answer and #8 Defendant Mike Pinto's Answer are stricken for failure to comply with the undersigned's Judge's Requirements. Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 12/10/2019. (CLO)
December 10, 2019 Filing 8 (STRICKEN per Order 9 ) ANSWER to Complaint by Mike Pinto.(Hirtz, Adam) Modified on 12/10/2019 (CLO).
December 10, 2019 Filing 7 (STRICKEN per Order 9 ) ANSWER to Complaint by PruGen, LLC.(Hirtz, Adam) Modified on 12/10/2019 (CLO).
December 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Mike Pinto, PruGen, LLC Sent To: State Court - Executed (Hirtz, Adam)
December 6, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Stephen R. Clark. (MFG)
December 5, 2019 Filing 5 Amended Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of Jefferson County, filed by Ivy Hembrador.(MFG)
December 5, 2019 Filing 4 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of Jefferson County, filed by Ivy Hembrador.(MFG)
December 5, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant PruGen, LLC f/k/a PreGen, Inc.. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Hirtz, Adam)
December 5, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Mike Pinto, PruGen, LLC f/k/a PreGen, Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (Hirtz, Adam)
December 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Jefferson County Circuit Court, case number 18JE-CC00753, with receipt number AMOEDC-7622873, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Mike Pinto, PruGen, LLC f/k/a PreGen, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A State Court File, #2 Exhibit B - Email, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D - First Amended Petition, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Original Filing Form)(Hirtz, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hembrador v. PruGen, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PruGen, LLC
Represented By: Adam D. Hirtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Pinto
Represented By: Adam D. Hirtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ivy Hembrador
Represented By: Matthew J. Ghio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?