Parker v. Internal Revenue Service
Plaintiff: Raevon Terrell Parker
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Case Number: 4:2019cv03251
Filed: December 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Henry Edward Autrey
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE to Motion re #15 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiff Raevon Terrell Parker. (EAB)
January 17, 2020 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #15 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Internal Revenue Service. (Jones, Joshua)
January 17, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant Internal Revenue Service. (Jones, Joshua)
January 10, 2020 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant Internal Revenue Service Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal Petition,, filed by Raevon Terrell Parker. Related document: #1 Notice of Removal Petition, filed by Internal Revenue Service.(AAS)
January 6, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiff Raevon Terrell Parker. (AAS)
December 27, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to 22nd Judicial Circuit Court of St. Louis City of Missouri filed by Defendant Internal Revenue Service. (Jones, Joshua)
December 23, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court of the 22nd Judicial Circuit Court of St. Louis City of Missouri by Plaintiff Raevon Terrell Parker. (MCB)
December 23, 2019 Filing 10 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Raevon Terrell Parker. (MCB)
December 20, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Internal Revenue Service. (Jones, Joshua)
December 20, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant Internal Revenue Service. (Jones, Joshua)
December 13, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION for Default Judgment filed by Defendant Internal Revenue Service. (Jones, Joshua)
December 11, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Default Judgment by Plaintiff Raevon Terrell Parker. (MFG)
December 11, 2019 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENTAL State Court Docket Sheet. (MFG)
December 11, 2019 Filing 4 Amended Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis City, filed by Raevon Terrell Parker.(MFG)
December 11, 2019 Filing 3 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis City, filed by Raevon Terrell Parker.(MFG)
December 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant U.S. on behalf of Internal Revenue Service Sent To: Plaintiff (Jones, Joshua)
December 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of St. Louis City, case number 1822-CC1524, Non-Jury Demand,, filed by U.S. on behalf of Internal Revenue Service. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 State Court File, #4 Notice to City Circuit Court)(Jones, Joshua)
December 11, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Henry E. Autrey. (MFG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker v. Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Joshua Michael Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raevon Terrell Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?