SBFO Operator No. 3, LLC et al v. Onex Corporation et al
Plaintiff: HC Stores 2017, LLC, SBFO Operator No. 9-Wichita, LLC, SBFO Operator No. 4, LLC, SBFO Operator No. 6, LLC, SBFO Operator No. 5, LLC, SBFO Operator No. 3, LLC and Anchor Mobile Food Markets, Inc.
Defendant: Onex Partners IV, LP, Matthew Ross, Anthony Munk and Onex Corporation
Case Number: 4:2019cv03271
Filed: December 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: John A Ross
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION to Clarify #17 Disclosure of OrganizationalInterests Certificate, #18 Disclosure of OrganizationalInterests Certificate Motion for Clarification by Defendants Anthony Munk, Onex Corporation, Onex Partners IV, LP, Matthew Ross. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Jan. 24, 2020 Email, #2 Exhibit 2 - Jan. 31, 2020 Email)(Martin, James)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Docket Text ORDER: GRANTING #19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Michael C. Keats by Defendants Anthony Munk, Onex Corporation, Onex Partners IV, LP, Matthew Ross. ; GRANTING #20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Peter L. Simmons by Defendants Anthony Munk, Onex Corporation, Onex Partners IV, LP, Matthew Ross.. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 2/6/20. (KKS)
February 4, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Peter L. Simmons. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-7730999) by Defendants Anthony Munk, Onex Corporation, Onex Partners IV, LP, Matthew Ross. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Simmons, Peter)
February 4, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Michael C. Keats. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-7730555) by Defendants Anthony Munk, Onex Corporation, Onex Partners IV, LP, Matthew Ross. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Keats, Michael)
January 23, 2020 Filing 18 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendants Anthony Munk, Onex Corporation, Onex Partners IV, LP, Matthew Ross. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: No,. (Martin, James)
January 23, 2020 Filing 17 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendants Anthony Munk, Onex Corporation, Onex Partners IV, LP, Matthew Ross. Parent companies: Onex Corporation, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: Yes,. (Martin, James)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #15 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Defendants Anthony Munk, Onex Corporation, Onex Partners IV, LP, Matthew Ross. (Martin, James) ; ORDERED GRANTED ( All Defendants Answer due 3/6/2020).Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 1/21/2020. (CLO)
January 21, 2020 Filing 15 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Defendants Anthony Munk, Onex Corporation, Onex Partners IV, LP, Matthew Ross. (Martin, James)
January 21, 2020 Filing 14 ENTRY of Appearance by James G. Martin for Defendants Anthony Munk, Onex Corporation, Onex Partners IV, LP, Matthew Ross. (Martin, James)
January 21, 2020 Filing 13 ENTRY of Appearance by James F. Bennett for Defendants Anthony Munk, Onex Corporation, Onex Partners IV, LP, Matthew Ross. (Bennett, James)
January 8, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: #10 (AMENDED AFFIDAVITS OF SERVICE as to ONEX Partners IV LP & ONEX Corp.) filed by SBFO Operator No. 9-Wichita, LLC, SBFO Operator No. 4, LLC, Anchor Mobile Food Markets, Inc., HC Stores 2017, LLC, SBFO Operator No. 3, LLC, SBFO Operator No. 5, LLC, SBFO Operator No. 6, LLC. (Calabro, Jason) Modified text on 1/9/2020 (KKS).
January 8, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by SBFO Operator No. 9-Wichita, LLC, SBFO Operator No. 4, LLC, Anchor Mobile Food Markets, Inc., HC Stores 2017, LLC, SBFO Operator No. 3, LLC, SBFO Operator No. 5, LLC, SBFO Operator No. 6, LLC. Anthony Munk served on 1/8/2020, answer due 1/29/2020; Matthew Ross served on 1/8/2020, answer due 1/29/2020. (Calabro, Jason)
January 3, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by SBFO Operator No. 9-Wichita, LLC, SBFO Operator No. 4, LLC, Anchor Mobile Food Markets, Inc., HC Stores 2017, LLC, SBFO Operator No. 3, LLC, SBFO Operator No. 5, LLC, SBFO Operator No. 6, LLC. Onex Corporation served on 12/23/2019, answer due 1/13/2020; Onex Partners IV, LP served on 12/23/2019, answer due 1/13/2020. (Calabro, Jason)
December 13, 2019 Summons Issued as to defendant All Defendants. The summons was emailed to Jason Toji Calabro. (MFG)
December 13, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable John A. Ross. (MFG)
December 13, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs Anchor Mobile Food Markets, Inc., HC Stores 2017, LLC, SBFO Operator No. 3, LLC, SBFO Operator No. 4, LLC, SBFO Operator No. 5, LLC, SBFO Operator No. 6, LLC, SBFO Operator No. 9-Wichita, LLC Process Server: Preferred Prcoess Servers, Inc. (Calabro, Jason)
December 13, 2019 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Anchor Mobile Food Markets, Inc... (Calabro, Jason)
December 13, 2019 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff SBFO Operator No. 9-Wichita, LLC.. (Calabro, Jason)
December 13, 2019 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff SBFO Operator No. 6, LLC.. (Calabro, Jason)
December 13, 2019 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff SBFO Operator No. 5, LLC.. (Calabro, Jason)
December 13, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff SBFO Operator No. 4, LLC.. (Calabro, Jason)
December 13, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff HC Stores 2017, LLC.. (Calabro, Jason)
December 13, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff SBFO Operator No. 3, LLC.. (Calabro, Jason)
December 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number AMOEDC-7639713, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by SBFO Operator No. 9-Wichita, LLC, SBFO Operator No. 4, LLC, Anchor Mobile Food Markets, Inc., HC Stores 2017, LLC, SBFO Operator No. 3, LLC, SBFO Operator No. 5, LLC, SBFO Operator No. 6, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons to Defendant Onex Corporation, #4 Summons to Defendant Onex Partners IV, LP, #5 Summons to Defendant Anthony Munk, #6 Summons to Defendant Matthew Ross)(Calabro, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SBFO Operator No. 3, LLC et al v. Onex Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HC Stores 2017, LLC
Represented By: Jason Toji Calabro
Represented By: J. Toji Calabro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SBFO Operator No. 9-Wichita, LLC
Represented By: Jason Toji Calabro
Represented By: J. Toji Calabro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SBFO Operator No. 4, LLC
Represented By: Jason Toji Calabro
Represented By: J. Toji Calabro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SBFO Operator No. 6, LLC
Represented By: Jason Toji Calabro
Represented By: J. Toji Calabro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SBFO Operator No. 5, LLC
Represented By: Jason Toji Calabro
Represented By: J. Toji Calabro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SBFO Operator No. 3, LLC
Represented By: Jason Toji Calabro
Represented By: J. Toji Calabro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anchor Mobile Food Markets, Inc.
Represented By: Jason Toji Calabro
Represented By: J. Toji Calabro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Onex Partners IV, LP
Represented By: Peter L. Simmons
Represented By: Michael Courtney Keats
Represented By: James F. Bennett
Represented By: James G. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Ross
Represented By: Peter L. Simmons
Represented By: Michael Courtney Keats
Represented By: James F. Bennett
Represented By: James G. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Munk
Represented By: Peter L. Simmons
Represented By: Michael Courtney Keats
Represented By: James F. Bennett
Represented By: James G. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Onex Corporation
Represented By: Peter L. Simmons
Represented By: Michael Courtney Keats
Represented By: James F. Bennett
Represented By: James G. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?