Nyumah et al v. Wolf et al
Plaintiff: John Tamba Nyumah, Victoria Roberts and John Nyumah
Defendant: Acting Director Ken Cuccinelli, Director Ann Marie Jordan-Starks, Acting Secretary Chad Wolf, Ann Marie Jordan-Starks, Ken Cuccinelli and Chad Wolf
Case Number: 4:2019cv03283
Filed: December 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: John A Ross
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1361
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2020 Filing 3 Alias Summons Issued as to defendant Ken Cuccinelli, Ann Marie Jordan-Starks, Chad Wolf. The summons were emailed to plaintiffs' attorney. (KKS)
February 6, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE Request to Issue Summons: by Plaintiffs John Nyumah, Victoria Roberts (Attachments: #1 Summons Wolf: Proposed Summons in a Civil Action, #2 Summons Cuccinelli: Proposed Summons in a Civil Action, #3 Summons Jordan-Starks: Proposed Summons in a Civil Action, #4 Summons MOED: Proposed Summons in a Civil Action, #5 Summons USAG: Proposed Summons in a Civil Action)(Khazaeli, Javad) ; **ALL Summons replaced to include the second page - (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/7/2020) (KKS). (Attachment 2 replaced on 2/7/2020) (KKS). (Attachment 3 replaced on 2/7/2020) (KKS). (Attachment 4 replaced on 2/7/2020) (KKS). (Attachment 5 replaced on 2/7/2020) (KKS). Modified on 2/7/2020 (KKS).
December 18, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Waivers issued 3. Judge Assigned: Honorable John A. Ross. (MFG)
December 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number CMOEDC-7644960, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by John Tamba Nyumah, Victoria Roberts. (Attachments: #1 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover, #3 Waiver of Service Notice and Waiver - Wolf, #4 Waiver of Service Notice and Waiver - Cucinneli, #5 Waiver of Service Notice and Waiver - Jordan-Starks, #6 Exhibit Affidavit of John Nyumah, #7 Exhibit Marriage Documents, #8 Exhibit Previously Filed I-485, #9 Exhibit RFE for FBAS, #10 Exhibit RFE Response, #11 Exhibit July 2017 RFE, #12 Exhibit Response to July 2017 RFE, #13 Exhibit Sept 2017 RFE, #14 Exhibit Update from USCIS website - James, #15 Exhibit 3/15/2018 Notice, #16 Exhibit McCaskil Case Inquiry, #17 Exhibit Updated Submission to USCIS, #18 Exhibit USCIS Case Status Update - John, #19 Exhibit USCIS Case processing times)(Khazaeli, Javad) Modified on 12/18/2019 (MFG). Exhibits 8, 10, 12 and 17 have been sealed due to personal identifiers in accordance to Local Rule 2.17

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nyumah et al v. Wolf et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Director Ken Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Ann Marie Jordan-Starks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Secretary Chad Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Marie Jordan-Starks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Tamba Nyumah
Represented By: Javad M. Khazaeli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Roberts
Represented By: Javad M. Khazaeli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Nyumah
Represented By: Javad M. Khazaeli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?