Smith v. Saul
Plaintiff: Jennifer M. Smith
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 4:2019cv03288
Filed: December 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Noelle C Collins
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2020 Filing 4 Letter to Clerk/Court from Plaintiff, Jennifer Smith re:Consent Form (TMT)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 3. Wed Jan 8 09:01:51 CST 2020 (Battle, Kinica)
January 8, 2020 Filing 3 Letter from Clerk sent to Plaintiff Jennifer M. Smith re: Failure to file Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 1/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 NOTICE REGARDING MAGISTRATE JUDGE JURISDICTION) (KCB)
December 18, 2019 Receipt 4644084577 in the amount of $400.00 for CIVIL FILING FEE on behalf of Jennifer M. Smith (CCAM)
December 18, 2019 Filing 2 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
December 18, 2019 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Wed Dec 18 12:01:14 CST 2019 (admin,)
December 18, 2019 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (JWD)
December 18, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 3 Summons(es) issued. The summons was mailed to plaintiff Jennifer M. Smith. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: Honorable Noelle C. Collins. (JWD)
December 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Andrew M. Saul, Jury Demand, filed by Jennifer M. Smith. (Attachments: #1 EEOC Decision and Right to Sue, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form, #4 Summons Saul, #5 Envelope)(JWD) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/18/2019: #6 Summons U.S. Attorney General, #7 Summons U.S. Attorney) (JWD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer M. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?