Alan Presswood, D.C., P.C. v. Biosense Medical Devices, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Alan Presswood, D.C., P.C.
Defendant: John Does 1-10, Scott Anthony Climes, Patricia A. Climes and Biosense Medical Devices, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv03303
Filed: December 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Ronnie L White
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47 U.S.C. ยง 0227
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER. The Court has been advised that this action has been settled as to defendants SCOTT ANTHONY CLIMES and PATRICIAL A. CLIMES, ONLY. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, that all pending motions are denied with prejudice as to defendants SCOTT ANTHONY CLIMES and PATRICIA A. CLIMES, ONLY. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel shall file within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order, file a stipulation for dismissal or a motion for leave to voluntarily dismiss as to defendants SCOTT ANTHONY CLIMES and PATRICIA A. CLIMES, ONLY. Failure to timely comply with this order shall result in the dismissal of this action against SCOTT ANTHONY CLIMES and PATRICIA A. CLIMES, with prejudice. (Dismissal Paper(s) due by 2/20/2020.) Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 1/21/2020. (CBL)
January 16, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Settlement with Defendants Climes Only by Patricia A. Climes, Scott Anthony Climes (Dickinson, Joshua)
January 14, 2020 Filing 16 ENTRY of Appearance by Shilee T. Mullin for Defendants Patricia A. Climes, Scott Anthony Climes. (Mullin, Shilee)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification (ECF No. 4) is DENIED without prejudice for failure to comply with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Plaintiff may refile a motion for class certification compliant with the federal rules subject to a case management order that will issue at a later date. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Joint Motion of Plaintiff and Defendants Scott Anthony Climes and Patricia A. Climes to Stay Briefing on Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification (ECF No. 14) is DENIED as moot. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 1/14/2020. (THL)
January 13, 2020 Filing 14 Joint MOTION to Stay Briefing on Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification #4 by Defendants Patricia A. Climes, Scott Anthony Climes. (Dickinson, Joshua)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants Scott Anthony Climes and Patricia A. Climes's Consent Motion for Second Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint (ECF No. 12) is GRANTED up to and including January 16, 2020. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 1/6/2020. (THL)
January 3, 2020 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Petition (Removal/Transfer) by Defendants Patricia A. Climes, Scott Anthony Climes. (Dickinson, Joshua)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Count IV only of Plaintiff's Class Action Petition (ECF No. #3 ) is DISMISSED without prejudice. All other counts remain pending. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 12/30/2019. (TMT)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants Scott Anthony Climes and Patricia A. Climes's Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint (ECF No. 7) is GRANTED up to and including January 6, 2020. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 12/30/19. (THL)
December 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Patricia A. Climes, Scott Anthony Climes Sent To: State Court - Executed (Attachments: #1 Ex 1 - Notice to State Court of Filing Notice of Removal)(Dickinson, Joshua)
December 24, 2019 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Alan Presswood, D.C., P.C.. Parent companies: None., Subsidiaries: None., Publicly held company: None.,. (Margulis, Max)
December 23, 2019 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Petition (Removal/Transfer) by Defendants Patricia A. Climes, Scott Anthony Climes. (Dickinson, Joshua)
December 23, 2019 Filing 6 Plaintiff's NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Alan Presswood, D.C., P.C. without prejudice of Count IV of Plaintiff's Complaint (Margulis, Max)
December 20, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #4 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Plaintiff Alan Presswood, D.C., P.C.. (MFG)
December 20, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Certify Class by Plaintiff Alan Presswood, D.C., P.C.. (MFG)
December 20, 2019 Filing 3 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis County, filed by Alan Presswood, D.C., P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(MFG)
December 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Patricia A. Climes, Scott Anthony Climes Sent To: Plaintiff (Dickinson, Joshua)
December 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis County Circuit Court, case number 19SL-CC04995, with receipt number AMOEDC-7651374, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Patricia A. Climes, Scott Anthony Climes. (Attachments: #1 Ex A - State Court Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form)(Dickinson, Joshua)
December 20, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Ronnie L. White. (MFG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alan Presswood, D.C., P.C. v. Biosense Medical Devices, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Anthony Climes
Represented By: Joshua C. Dickinson
Represented By: Shilee T. Mullin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia A. Climes
Represented By: Joshua C. Dickinson
Represented By: Shilee T. Mullin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biosense Medical Devices, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Presswood, D.C., P.C.
Represented By: Max G. Margulis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?