Abram et al v. TitleMax of Missouri, Inc.
Plaintiff: Melvin Allman, Marian Alexander, Varnice Allen, Stephanie Alyadumi, Camille Adkins, Kimberly Abram, Lamont Amos, Kendra Akers, Tracey Allen, John Adams and Lamont Amos, Jr.
Defendant: TitleMax of Missouri, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv03322
Filed: December 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Henry Edward Autrey
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that oral argument on Plaintiffs Motion to Remand [Doc. #7 ] is set for Wednesday, March 4, 2020, at 2:30 p.m. in a special session of the Court to be held at St. Louis University School of Law, 100 N. Tucker, 12th Floor, St. Louis, Missouri 63102. Ten (10) minutes will be allotted to Plaintiffs and ten (10) minutes will be allotted to Defendants to argue. Movants will then be allowed five (5) minutes for rebuttal.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Order setting this special session of Court will be filed in this matter by separate docket entry. (cc:USMS) Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2020 02:30 PM before District Judge Henry Edward Autrey.. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 02/20/2020. (AAT)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER - In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 141 et seq, stating from time to time "special sessions of the district court may be held at such places in the district as the nature of the business may require," the U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri shall hold a special session at St. Louis University School of Law, 100 N. Tucker, 12th Floor, St. Louis, Missouri 63102, on March 4, 2020, at 1:30 P.M., the undersigned District Judge presiding.The Court will notify the parties to be present for oral argument at a later date. Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2020 01:30 PM before District Judge Henry Edward Autrey.. (cc: USMS) Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel and District Judge Henry E. Autrey on 02/19/2020. (AAT)
February 5, 2020 Filing 19 SURREPLY to Motion re #7 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court for the Twenty-Third Judicial Circuit, Jefferson County, Missouri filed by Defendant TitleMax of Missouri, Inc.. (KJS)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Docket Text ORDER: Re: (16 in 4:19-cv-03325-HEA) MOTION for Leave to File a Surreply by Plaintiffs Marketha L. Baker, Simone Baker, Tracey Ballard, Laurie Ballew, Antonio Banks, Cara Banks, David Banskter, Gwendolyn Bates, Latoyia Bates, Kennesha Beals. (17 in 4:19-cv-03326-HEA) MOTION for Leave to File a Surreply by Plaintiffs Jeanette Beckermann, Carol Begemman, Alois Bell, Jackie Belland, Cesar Benavidez, Virginia Berg, Darrell Berry, Jr., Christina Bertram, Anthony Berwin, Lera Birdsall. (16 in 4:19-cv-03323-HEA) MOTION for Leave to File a Surreply by Plaintiffs Cortney Anderson, Julie Anderson, Lajuan Anderson, Beverly Andrews, Bradley Andrews, Jamie Angelo, Lisa Ardrey, Joni Armer, Evelyn Arnold, Ann Arnone. rson, (18 in 4:19-cv-03331-HEA) MOTION for Leave to File a Surreply by Plaintiffs Jamie Brizendine, Brandon Brooks, Jessica Brooks, Julie Brooks, Shaunett Brooks, Anthony Brose, Anna Brown, Candace Brown, Demisha Brown, Jerrett Brown. (16 in 4:19-cv-03329-HEA) MOTION for Leave to File a Surreply by Plaintiffs Kiaela Bracy, Cynthia Braden, Robert Bradley, Darren Brake, Donyella Brandon, Alicia Brashears, Brittany Breen, Denise Brewer, James Brister, Ceanna Irwin. (16 in 4:19-cv-03328-HEA) MOTION for Leave to File a Surreply by Plaintiffs Dea Bollin, Shaun Bonner, Kenneth Boofer, Rosemary Booker, Grant Boolin, Hellen Booth, Angela Bottorff, Ember Bower, Bethany Boyd, Paul Boyle. (16 in 4:19-cv-03327-HEA) MOTION for Leave to File a Surreply by Plaintiffs Mary Birmingham, Cody Bishop, Tony Black, James Blancas, Rudolph Bledsoe, Chrystal Blocker, Levita Blockton, Steven Blome, Jessica Bogert, Maudrea Boles. (16 in 4:19-cv-03324-HEA) MOTION for Leave to File a Surreply by Plaintiffs Cynthia Arteaga, Crystal Askins, Samuel Atchley, Ashlee Attawy, Corey Atterberry, Tommy Aubuchon, Jeffrey Avery, Corey Bailey, Heavenly Bailey, Michelle Bailey. (17 in 4:19-cv-03322-HEA) MOTION for Leave to File a Surreply by Plaintiffs Kimberly Abram, John Adams, Camille Adkins, Kendra Akers, Marian Alexander, Tracey Allen, Varnice Allen, Melvin Allman, Stephanie Alyadumi, Lamont Amos, Jr. (16 in 4:19-cv-03332-HEA) MOTION for Leave to File a Surreply by Plaintiffs Judith Brown, Lori Brown, Raymond Brown, Robyn Brown, Sharon Brown, Perry Bryant, Michelle Buhlinger, Michael Buie, Christina Bunnell, Marvin Burchett. ; LEAVE TO FILE IS GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on February 5, 2020. (MCB)
February 4, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to File a Surreply by Plaintiffs Kimberly Abram, John Adams, Camille Adkins, Kendra Akers, Marian Alexander, Tracey Allen, Varnice Allen, Melvin Allman, Stephanie Alyadumi, Lamont Amos, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Surreply to Motion to Remand)(Onder, James)
February 3, 2020 Filing 16 SURREPLY to Motion re #7 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court for the Twenty-Third Judicial Circuit, Jefferson County, Missouri filed by Defendant TitleMax of Missouri, Inc.. (MCB)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #14 MOTION for Leave to FILE SURREPLY by Defendant TitleMax of Missouri, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Durone, Anthony) filed by TitleMax of Missouri, Inc. ; ORDERED LEAVE TO FILE SUR-REPLY IS GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on February 3, 2020. (MCB)
January 31, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to FILE SURREPLY by Defendant TitleMax of Missouri, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Durone, Anthony)
January 24, 2020 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court for the Twenty-Third Judicial Circuit, Jefferson County, Missouri filed by Plaintiffs Kimberly Abram, John Adams, Camille Adkins, Kendra Akers, Marian Alexander, Tracey Allen, Varnice Allen, Melvin Allman, Stephanie Alyadumi, Lamont Amos, Jr. (Onder, James)
January 17, 2020 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court for the Twenty-Third Judicial Circuit, Jefferson County, Missouri filed by Defendant TitleMax of Missouri, Inc.. (Durone, Anthony)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 11. sent to non-electronic party this date Mon Jan 13 09:04:10 CST 2020 (Berg, Melanie)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Docket Text ORDER: Re #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court for the Twenty-Third Judicial Circuit, Jefferson County, Missouri (Unopposed) by Defendant TitleMax of Missouri, Inc.; ADDITIONAL TIME IS GRANTED UP TO AND INCLUDING JANUARY 17, 2020. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 1/10/20. (EAB)
January 9, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court for the Twenty-Third Judicial Circuit, Jefferson County, Missouri (Unopposed) by Defendant TitleMax of Missouri, Inc.. (Durone, Anthony)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 9. Thu Jan 2 08:24:50 CST 2020 (Shepard, Alicia)
January 2, 2020 Filing 9 Letter to attorney Craig W. Richards from Deputy Clerk Re:admission to the bar (AAS)
December 31, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #7 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court for the Twenty-Third Judicial Circuit, Jefferson County, Missouri filed by Plaintiffs Kimberly Abram, John Adams, Camille Adkins, Kendra Akers, Marian Alexander, Tracey Allen, Varnice Allen, Melvin Allman, Stephanie Alyadumi, Lamont Amos, Jr. (Onder, James)
December 31, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court for the Twenty-Third Judicial Circuit, Jefferson County, Missouri by Plaintiffs Kimberly Abram, John Adams, Camille Adkins, Kendra Akers, Marian Alexander, Tracey Allen, Varnice Allen, Melvin Allman, Stephanie Alyadumi, Lamont Amos, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Abram Title Loan, #2 TitleMax Correspondence)(Onder, James)
December 26, 2019 Filing 6 Letter to attorney Craig W. Richards from Deputy Clerk Re:admission to the Eastern District of Missouri (JWD)
December 26, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Henry E. Autrey. (JWD)
December 24, 2019 Filing 5 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Jefferson County Circuit Court, filed by Tracey Allen, Camille Adkins, Varnice Allen, Stephanie Alyadumi, John Adams, Melvin Allman, Kimberly Abram, Kendra Akers, Lamont Amos, Marian Alexander. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(JWD)
December 24, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) filed by Defendant TitleMax of Missouri, Inc.. (Durone, Anthony)
December 24, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant TitleMax of Missouri, Inc... (Durone, Anthony)
December 24, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant TitleMax of Missouri, Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Durone, Anthony)
December 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Jefferson County, case number 19JE-CC00803, with receipt number AMOEDC-7656232, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by TitleMax of Missouri, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A State Court File, #2 Exhibit B Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit C Original Filing Form)(Durone, Anthony) Modified on 12/26/2019 (JWD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abram et al v. TitleMax of Missouri, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin Allman
Represented By: Craig Richards, I
Represented By: Martin L. Daesch
Represented By: James G. Onder
Represented By: Jesse B. Rochman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marian Alexander
Represented By: Craig Richards, I
Represented By: Martin L. Daesch
Represented By: James G. Onder
Represented By: Jesse B. Rochman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Varnice Allen
Represented By: Craig Richards, I
Represented By: Martin L. Daesch
Represented By: James G. Onder
Represented By: Jesse B. Rochman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Alyadumi
Represented By: Craig Richards, I
Represented By: Martin L. Daesch
Represented By: James G. Onder
Represented By: Jesse B. Rochman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Camille Adkins
Represented By: Craig Richards, I
Represented By: Martin L. Daesch
Represented By: James G. Onder
Represented By: Jesse B. Rochman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Abram
Represented By: Craig Richards, I
Represented By: Martin L. Daesch
Represented By: James G. Onder
Represented By: Jesse B. Rochman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lamont Amos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kendra Akers
Represented By: Craig Richards, I
Represented By: Martin L. Daesch
Represented By: James G. Onder
Represented By: Jesse B. Rochman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracey Allen
Represented By: Craig Richards, I
Represented By: Martin L. Daesch
Represented By: James G. Onder
Represented By: Jesse B. Rochman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Adams
Represented By: Craig Richards, I
Represented By: Martin L. Daesch
Represented By: James G. Onder
Represented By: Jesse B. Rochman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lamont Amos, Jr.
Represented By: Craig Richards, I
Represented By: Martin L. Daesch
Represented By: James G. Onder
Represented By: Jesse B. Rochman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TitleMax of Missouri, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Durone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?