Brizendine et al v. TitleMax of Missouri, Inc.
Plaintiff: Candace Brown, Jessica Brooks, Brandon Brooks, Jamie Brizendine, Demisha Brown, Anthony Brose, Anna Brown, Shaunett Brooks, Jerrett Brown and Julie Brooks
Defendant: TitleMax of Missouri, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv03331
Filed: December 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Henry Edward Autrey
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2020 Filing 20 SURREPLY to Motion re #9 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court for the Twenty-Third Judicial Circuit, Jefferson County, Missouri filed by Defendant TitleMax of Missouri, Inc.. (JMP)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Docket Text ORDER: Re: (16 in 4:19-cv-03325-HEA) MOTION for Leave to File a Surreply by Plaintiffs Marketha L. Baker, Simone Baker, Tracey Ballard, Laurie Ballew, Antonio Banks, Cara Banks, David Banskter, Gwendolyn Bates, Latoyia Bates, Kennesha Beals. (17 in 4:19-cv-03326-HEA) MOTION for Leave to File a Surreply by Plaintiffs Jeanette Beckermann, Carol Begemman, Alois Bell, Jackie Belland, Cesar Benavidez, Virginia Berg, Darrell Berry, Jr., Christina Bertram, Anthony Berwin, Lera Birdsall. (16 in 4:19-cv-03323-HEA) MOTION for Leave to File a Surreply by Plaintiffs Cortney Anderson, Julie Anderson, Lajuan Anderson, Beverly Andrews, Bradley Andrews, Jamie Angelo, Lisa Ardrey, Joni Armer, Evelyn Arnold, Ann Arnone. rson, (18 in 4:19-cv-03331-HEA) MOTION for Leave to File a Surreply by Plaintiffs Jamie Brizendine, Brandon Brooks, Jessica Brooks, Julie Brooks, Shaunett Brooks, Anthony Brose, Anna Brown, Candace Brown, Demisha Brown, Jerrett Brown. (16 in 4:19-cv-03329-HEA) MOTION for Leave to File a Surreply by Plaintiffs Kiaela Bracy, Cynthia Braden, Robert Bradley, Darren Brake, Donyella Brandon, Alicia Brashears, Brittany Breen, Denise Brewer, James Brister, Ceanna Irwin. (16 in 4:19-cv-03328-HEA) MOTION for Leave to File a Surreply by Plaintiffs Dea Bollin, Shaun Bonner, Kenneth Boofer, Rosemary Booker, Grant Boolin, Hellen Booth, Angela Bottorff, Ember Bower, Bethany Boyd, Paul Boyle. (16 in 4:19-cv-03327-HEA) MOTION for Leave to File a Surreply by Plaintiffs Mary Birmingham, Cody Bishop, Tony Black, James Blancas, Rudolph Bledsoe, Chrystal Blocker, Levita Blockton, Steven Blome, Jessica Bogert, Maudrea Boles. (16 in 4:19-cv-03324-HEA) MOTION for Leave to File a Surreply by Plaintiffs Cynthia Arteaga, Crystal Askins, Samuel Atchley, Ashlee Attawy, Corey Atterberry, Tommy Aubuchon, Jeffrey Avery, Corey Bailey, Heavenly Bailey, Michelle Bailey. (17 in 4:19-cv-03322-HEA) MOTION for Leave to File a Surreply by Plaintiffs Kimberly Abram, John Adams, Camille Adkins, Kendra Akers, Marian Alexander, Tracey Allen, Varnice Allen, Melvin Allman, Stephanie Alyadumi, Lamont Amos, Jr. (16 in 4:19-cv-03332-HEA) MOTION for Leave to File a Surreply by Plaintiffs Judith Brown, Lori Brown, Raymond Brown, Robyn Brown, Sharon Brown, Perry Bryant, Michelle Buhlinger, Michael Buie, Christina Bunnell, Marvin Burchett. ; LEAVE TO FILE IS GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on February 5, 2020. (MCB)
February 4, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to File a Surreply by Plaintiffs Jamie Brizendine, Brandon Brooks, Jessica Brooks, Julie Brooks, Shaunett Brooks, Anthony Brose, Anna Brown, Candace Brown, Demisha Brown, Jerrett Brown. (Attachments: #1 Surreply to Motion to Remand)(Onder, James)
February 3, 2020 Filing 17 SURREPLY to Motion re #9 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court for the Twenty-Third Judicial Circuit, Jefferson County, Missouri filed by Defendant TitleMax of Missouri, Inc.. (MCB)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Docket Text ORDER: Re: (13 in 4:19-cv-03329-HEA) MOTION for Leave to FILE SURREPLY by Defendant TitleMax of Missouri, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Durone, Anthony) filed by TitleMax of Missouri, Inc., (13 in 4:19-cv-03327-HEA) MOTION for Leave to FILE SURREPLY by Defendant TitleMax of Missouri, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Durone, Anthony) filed by TitleMax of Missouri, Inc., (13 in 4:19-cv-03325-HEA) MOTION for Leave to FILE SURREPLY by Defendant TitleMax of Missouri, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Durone, Anthony) filed by TitleMax of Missouri, Inc., (13 in 4:19-cv-03326-HEA) MOTION for Leave to FILE SURREPLY by Defendant TitleMax of Missouri, Inc.. (Durone, Anthony) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/3/2020: # 1 Exhibit A) (MCB). filed by TitleMax of Missouri, Inc., (13 in 4:19-cv-03323-HEA) MOTION for Leave to FILE SURREPLY by Defendant TitleMax of Missouri, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Durone, Anthony) filed by TitleMax of Missouri, Inc., (13 in 4:19-cv-03328-HEA) MOTION for Leave to FILE SURREPLY by Defendant TitleMax of Missouri, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Durone, Anthony) filed by TitleMax of Missouri, Inc., (13 in 4:19-cv-03332-HEA) MOTION for Leave to FILE SURREPLY by Defendant TitleMax of Missouri, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Durone, Anthony) filed by TitleMax of Missouri, Inc., (15 in 4:19-cv-03331-HEA) MOTION for Leave to FILE SURREPLY by Defendant TitleMax of Missouri, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Durone, Anthony) filed by TitleMax of Missouri, Inc., (13 in 4:19-cv-03324-HEA) MOTION for Leave to FILE SURREPLY by Defendant TitleMax of Missouri, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Durone, Anthony) filed by TitleMax of Missouri, Inc. ; LEAVE TO FILE SUR-REPLY IS GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on February 3, 2020. (MCB)
January 31, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to FILE SURREPLY by Defendant TitleMax of Missouri, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Durone, Anthony)
January 24, 2020 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court for the Twenty-Third Judicial Circuit, Jefferson County, Missouri filed by Plaintiffs Jamie Brizendine, Brandon Brooks, Jessica Brooks, Julie Brooks, Shaunett Brooks, Anthony Brose, Anna Brown, Candace Brown, Demisha Brown, Jerrett Brown. (Onder, James)
January 17, 2020 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court for the Twenty-Third Judicial Circuit, Jefferson County, Missouri filed by Defendant TitleMax of Missouri, Inc.. (Durone, Anthony)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 12. sent to non-electronic party this date Mon Jan 13 09:10:10 CST 2020 (Berg, Melanie)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Docket Text ORDER: Re #11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court for the Twenty-Third Judicial Circuit, Jefferson County, Missouri (Unopposed) by Defendant TitleMax of Missouri, Inc.; ADDITIONAL TIME IS GRANTED UP TO AND INCLUDING JANUARY 17, 2020. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 1/10/20. (EAB)
January 9, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court for the Twenty-Third Judicial Circuit, Jefferson County, Missouri (Unopposed) by Defendant TitleMax of Missouri, Inc.. (Durone, Anthony)
December 31, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #9 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court for the Twenty-Third Judicial Circuit, Jefferson County, Missouri filed by Plaintiffs Jamie Brizendine, Brandon Brooks, Jessica Brooks, Julie Brooks, Shaunett Brooks, Anthony Brose, Anna Brown, Candace Brown, Demisha Brown, Jerrett Brown. (Onder, James)
December 31, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court for the Twenty-Third Judicial Circuit, Jefferson County, Missouri by Plaintiffs Jamie Brizendine, Brandon Brooks, Jessica Brooks, Julie Brooks, Shaunett Brooks, Anthony Brose, Anna Brown, Candace Brown, Demisha Brown, Jerrett Brown. (Attachments: #1 Abram Title Loan, #2 TitleMax Correspondence)(Onder, James)
December 26, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Henry E. Autrey. (JWD)
December 26, 2019 Filing 8 Letter to attorney Craig W. Richards from Deputy Clerk Re:admission to the Eastern District of Missouri (JWD)
December 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE Certificate of Filing of Notice of Removal in State Court and Proof of Service: by Defendant TitleMax of Missouri, Inc. (Durone, Anthony)
December 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant TitleMax of Missouri, Inc. Sent To: State Court - Executed (Durone, Anthony)
December 24, 2019 Filing 7 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Jefferson County Circuit Court, filed by Anthony Brose, Brandon Brooks, Anna Brown, Demisha Brown, Jessica Brooks, Candace Brown, Jamie Brizendine, Julie Brooks, Jerrett Brown, Shaunett Brooks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(JWD)
December 24, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant TitleMax of Missouri, Inc... (Durone, Anthony)
December 24, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) filed by Defendant TitleMax of Missouri, Inc.. (Durone, Anthony)
December 24, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant TitleMax of Missouri, Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Durone, Anthony)
December 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Jefferson County, case number 19JE-CC00804, with receipt number AMOEDC-7656315, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by TitleMax of Missouri, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Durone, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brizendine et al v. TitleMax of Missouri, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candace Brown
Represented By: Craig Richards, I
Represented By: Martin L. Daesch
Represented By: James G. Onder
Represented By: Jesse B. Rochman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Brooks
Represented By: Craig Richards, I
Represented By: Martin L. Daesch
Represented By: James G. Onder
Represented By: Jesse B. Rochman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Brooks
Represented By: Craig Richards, I
Represented By: Martin L. Daesch
Represented By: James G. Onder
Represented By: Jesse B. Rochman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Brizendine
Represented By: Craig Richards, I
Represented By: Martin L. Daesch
Represented By: James G. Onder
Represented By: Jesse B. Rochman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demisha Brown
Represented By: Craig Richards, I
Represented By: Martin L. Daesch
Represented By: James G. Onder
Represented By: Jesse B. Rochman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Brose
Represented By: Craig Richards, I
Represented By: Martin L. Daesch
Represented By: James G. Onder
Represented By: Jesse B. Rochman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Brown
Represented By: Craig Richards, I
Represented By: Martin L. Daesch
Represented By: James G. Onder
Represented By: Jesse B. Rochman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaunett Brooks
Represented By: Craig Richards, I
Represented By: Martin L. Daesch
Represented By: James G. Onder
Represented By: Jesse B. Rochman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerrett Brown
Represented By: Craig Richards, I
Represented By: Martin L. Daesch
Represented By: James G. Onder
Represented By: Jesse B. Rochman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Brooks
Represented By: Craig Richards, I
Represented By: Martin L. Daesch
Represented By: James G. Onder
Represented By: Jesse B. Rochman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TitleMax of Missouri, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Durone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?