Brown et al v. TitleMax of Missouri, Inc.
Plaintiff: Perry Bryant, Michelle Buhlinger, Christina Bunnell, Sharon Brown, Raymond Brown, Lori Brown, Michael Buie, Marvin Burchett, Robyn Brown and Judith Brown
Defendant: TitleMax of Missouri, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv03332
Filed: December 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Henry Edward Autrey
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2020 Filing 18 SURREPLY to Motion re #7 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court for the Twenty-Third Judicial Circuit, Jefferson County, Missouri filed by Defendant TitleMax of Missouri, Inc.. (JMP)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Docket Text ORDER: Re: (16 in 4:19-cv-03325-HEA) MOTION for Leave to File a Surreply by Plaintiffs Marketha L. Baker, Simone Baker, Tracey Ballard, Laurie Ballew, Antonio Banks, Cara Banks, David Banskter, Gwendolyn Bates, Latoyia Bates, Kennesha Beals. (17 in 4:19-cv-03326-HEA) MOTION for Leave to File a Surreply by Plaintiffs Jeanette Beckermann, Carol Begemman, Alois Bell, Jackie Belland, Cesar Benavidez, Virginia Berg, Darrell Berry, Jr., Christina Bertram, Anthony Berwin, Lera Birdsall. (16 in 4:19-cv-03323-HEA) MOTION for Leave to File a Surreply by Plaintiffs Cortney Anderson, Julie Anderson, Lajuan Anderson, Beverly Andrews, Bradley Andrews, Jamie Angelo, Lisa Ardrey, Joni Armer, Evelyn Arnold, Ann Arnone. rson, (18 in 4:19-cv-03331-HEA) MOTION for Leave to File a Surreply by Plaintiffs Jamie Brizendine, Brandon Brooks, Jessica Brooks, Julie Brooks, Shaunett Brooks, Anthony Brose, Anna Brown, Candace Brown, Demisha Brown, Jerrett Brown. (16 in 4:19-cv-03329-HEA) MOTION for Leave to File a Surreply by Plaintiffs Kiaela Bracy, Cynthia Braden, Robert Bradley, Darren Brake, Donyella Brandon, Alicia Brashears, Brittany Breen, Denise Brewer, James Brister, Ceanna Irwin. (16 in 4:19-cv-03328-HEA) MOTION for Leave to File a Surreply by Plaintiffs Dea Bollin, Shaun Bonner, Kenneth Boofer, Rosemary Booker, Grant Boolin, Hellen Booth, Angela Bottorff, Ember Bower, Bethany Boyd, Paul Boyle. (16 in 4:19-cv-03327-HEA) MOTION for Leave to File a Surreply by Plaintiffs Mary Birmingham, Cody Bishop, Tony Black, James Blancas, Rudolph Bledsoe, Chrystal Blocker, Levita Blockton, Steven Blome, Jessica Bogert, Maudrea Boles. (16 in 4:19-cv-03324-HEA) MOTION for Leave to File a Surreply by Plaintiffs Cynthia Arteaga, Crystal Askins, Samuel Atchley, Ashlee Attawy, Corey Atterberry, Tommy Aubuchon, Jeffrey Avery, Corey Bailey, Heavenly Bailey, Michelle Bailey. (17 in 4:19-cv-03322-HEA) MOTION for Leave to File a Surreply by Plaintiffs Kimberly Abram, John Adams, Camille Adkins, Kendra Akers, Marian Alexander, Tracey Allen, Varnice Allen, Melvin Allman, Stephanie Alyadumi, Lamont Amos, Jr. (16 in 4:19-cv-03332-HEA) MOTION for Leave to File a Surreply by Plaintiffs Judith Brown, Lori Brown, Raymond Brown, Robyn Brown, Sharon Brown, Perry Bryant, Michelle Buhlinger, Michael Buie, Christina Bunnell, Marvin Burchett. ; LEAVE TO FILE IS GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on February 5, 2020. (MCB)
February 4, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to File a Surreply by Plaintiffs Judith Brown, Lori Brown, Raymond Brown, Robyn Brown, Sharon Brown, Perry Bryant, Michelle Buhlinger, Michael Buie, Christina Bunnell, Marvin Burchett. (Attachments: #1 Surreply to Motion to Remand)(Onder, James)
February 3, 2020 Filing 15 SURREPLY to Motion re #7 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court for the Twenty-Third Judicial Circuit, Jefferson County, Missouri filed by Defendant TitleMax of Missouri, Inc.. (MCB)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Docket Text ORDER: Re: (13 in 4:19-cv-03329-HEA) MOTION for Leave to FILE SURREPLY by Defendant TitleMax of Missouri, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Durone, Anthony) filed by TitleMax of Missouri, Inc., (13 in 4:19-cv-03327-HEA) MOTION for Leave to FILE SURREPLY by Defendant TitleMax of Missouri, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Durone, Anthony) filed by TitleMax of Missouri, Inc., (13 in 4:19-cv-03325-HEA) MOTION for Leave to FILE SURREPLY by Defendant TitleMax of Missouri, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Durone, Anthony) filed by TitleMax of Missouri, Inc., (13 in 4:19-cv-03326-HEA) MOTION for Leave to FILE SURREPLY by Defendant TitleMax of Missouri, Inc.. (Durone, Anthony) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/3/2020: # 1 Exhibit A) (MCB). filed by TitleMax of Missouri, Inc., (13 in 4:19-cv-03323-HEA) MOTION for Leave to FILE SURREPLY by Defendant TitleMax of Missouri, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Durone, Anthony) filed by TitleMax of Missouri, Inc., (13 in 4:19-cv-03328-HEA) MOTION for Leave to FILE SURREPLY by Defendant TitleMax of Missouri, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Durone, Anthony) filed by TitleMax of Missouri, Inc., (13 in 4:19-cv-03332-HEA) MOTION for Leave to FILE SURREPLY by Defendant TitleMax of Missouri, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Durone, Anthony) filed by TitleMax of Missouri, Inc., (15 in 4:19-cv-03331-HEA) MOTION for Leave to FILE SURREPLY by Defendant TitleMax of Missouri, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Durone, Anthony) filed by TitleMax of Missouri, Inc., (13 in 4:19-cv-03324-HEA) MOTION for Leave to FILE SURREPLY by Defendant TitleMax of Missouri, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Durone, Anthony) filed by TitleMax of Missouri, Inc. ; LEAVE TO FILE SUR-REPLY IS GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on February 3, 2020. (MCB)
January 31, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to FILE SURREPLY by Defendant TitleMax of Missouri, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Durone, Anthony)
January 24, 2020 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court for the Twenty-Third Judicial Circuit, Jefferson County, Missouri filed by Plaintiffs Judith Brown, Lori Brown, Raymond Brown, Robyn Brown, Sharon Brown, Perry Bryant, Michelle Buhlinger, Michael Buie, Christina Bunnell, Marvin Burchett. (Onder, James)
January 17, 2020 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court for the Twenty-Third Judicial Circuit, Jefferson County, Missouri filed by Defendant TitleMax of Missouri, Inc.. (Durone, Anthony)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 10. sent to non-electronic party this date Mon Jan 13 09:11:03 CST 2020 (Berg, Melanie)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Docket Text ORDER: Re #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court for the Twenty-Third Judicial Circuit, Jefferson County, Missouri (Unopposed) by Defendant TitleMax of Missouri, Inc.; ADDITIONAL TIME IS GRANTED UP TO AND INCLUDING JANUARY 17, 2020. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 1/10/20. (EAB)
January 9, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court for the Twenty-Third Judicial Circuit, Jefferson County, Missouri (Unopposed) by Defendant TitleMax of Missouri, Inc.. (Durone, Anthony)
December 31, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #7 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court for the Twenty-Third Judicial Circuit, Jefferson County, Missouri filed by Plaintiffs Judith Brown, Lori Brown, Raymond Brown, Robyn Brown, Sharon Brown, Perry Bryant, Michelle Buhlinger, Michael Buie, Christina Bunnell, Marvin Burchett. (Onder, James)
December 31, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court for the Twenty-Third Judicial Circuit, Jefferson County, Missouri by Plaintiffs Judith Brown, Lori Brown, Raymond Brown, Robyn Brown, Sharon Brown, Perry Bryant, Michelle Buhlinger, Michael Buie, Christina Bunnell, Marvin Burchett. (Attachments: #1 Abram Title Loan, #2 TitleMax Correspondence)(Onder, James)
December 26, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Henry E. Autrey. (JWD)
December 26, 2019 Filing 6 Letter to attorney Craig W. Richards from Deputy Clerk Re:admission to the Eastern District of Missouri (JWD)
December 24, 2019 Filing 5 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Jefferson County Circuit Court, filed by Perry Bryant, Raymond Brown, Michelle Buhlinger, Christina Bunnell, Lori Brown, Michael Buie, Judith Brown, Robyn Brown, Marvin Burchett, Sharon Brown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(JWD)
December 24, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant TitleMax of Missouri, Inc... (Durone, Anthony)
December 24, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) filed by Defendant TitleMax of Missouri, Inc.. (Durone, Anthony)
December 24, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant TitleMax of Missouri, Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Durone, Anthony)
December 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Jefferson County, case number 19JE-CC00805, with receipt number AMOEDC-7656350, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by TitleMax of Missouri, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Durone, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown et al v. TitleMax of Missouri, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perry Bryant
Represented By: Craig Richards, I
Represented By: Martin L. Daesch
Represented By: James G. Onder
Represented By: Jesse B. Rochman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Buhlinger
Represented By: Craig Richards, I
Represented By: Martin L. Daesch
Represented By: James G. Onder
Represented By: Jesse B. Rochman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Bunnell
Represented By: Craig Richards, I
Represented By: Martin L. Daesch
Represented By: James G. Onder
Represented By: Jesse B. Rochman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Brown
Represented By: Craig Richards, I
Represented By: Martin L. Daesch
Represented By: James G. Onder
Represented By: Jesse B. Rochman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Brown
Represented By: Craig Richards, I
Represented By: Martin L. Daesch
Represented By: James G. Onder
Represented By: Jesse B. Rochman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Brown
Represented By: Craig Richards, I
Represented By: Martin L. Daesch
Represented By: James G. Onder
Represented By: Jesse B. Rochman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Buie
Represented By: Craig Richards, I
Represented By: Martin L. Daesch
Represented By: James G. Onder
Represented By: Jesse B. Rochman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvin Burchett
Represented By: Craig Richards, I
Represented By: Martin L. Daesch
Represented By: James G. Onder
Represented By: Jesse B. Rochman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robyn Brown
Represented By: Craig Richards, I
Represented By: Martin L. Daesch
Represented By: James G. Onder
Represented By: Jesse B. Rochman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Brown
Represented By: Craig Richards, I
Represented By: Martin L. Daesch
Represented By: James G. Onder
Represented By: Jesse B. Rochman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TitleMax of Missouri, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Durone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?